Case: PD-0399-17    
PD-0399-17
05/26/2017
PDR Case Type
WALKER, KENYETTA DANYELL 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/30/2017ORDER ISSD/1.051 
08/30/2017MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD - DISPOSITIONGranted
08/30/2017MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILEDFiled
08/28/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
08/23/2017PDR GRANTED 
08/23/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/26/2017PDR FILED 
04/28/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
04/28/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/2017HOLDSUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateEmily Johnson-Liu
WALKER, KENYETTA DANYELLAppellantChristine R. Brown-Zeto
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
03-30-17 
7th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court 
Orange 
 
B-150206-R 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site