Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0398-17    
PD-0398-17
04/28/2017
PDR Case Type
OLIVA, JOSE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/28/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
07/27/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
07/26/2017PDR GRANTED 
07/26/2017PDR DISPGranted
05/04/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/28/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/2017STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStatePatricia McLean
OLIVA, JOSEAppellantTheodore Lee Wood
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
03-28-17 
14th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 1 
Harris 
 
2025101 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site