Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0381-17    
PD-0381-17
04/26/2017
PDR Case Type
MENDEZ, ADRIAN AARON JR. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/20/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/2017BRIEF FILED 
07/11/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
07/03/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
06/28/2017PDR GRANTED 
06/28/2017PDR DISPGranted
05/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/26/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/2017COPIESBRIEFS COPIES DUE
08/21/2017STATUSAPPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MENDEZ, Jr., ADRIAN AARONAppellantKurt B. Wentz
STATE OF TEXASStateMolly Wurzer
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
04-04-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
339th District Court 
Harris 
 
1316546 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site