Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0324-17    
PD-0324-17
04/11/2017
PDR Case Type
MARTINEZ, ROGER ANTHONY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/22/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellee
08/07/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2017SUBMITTED 
10/04/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
10/04/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
09/22/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/06/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/06/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/08/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
08/07/2017BRIEF FILED 
07/27/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
07/26/2017PDR GRANTED 
07/26/2017PDR DISPGranted
04/19/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/11/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARTINEZ, ROGER ANTHONYAppelleeLuis A. Martinez
STATE OF TEXASStateBrendan Wyatt Guy
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
03-16-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Victoria 
 
14-06-28047-A 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site