Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0314-18    
PD-0314-18
03/23/2018
PDR Case Type
CUEVAS, JEREMY JAY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/30/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
07/11/2018BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/30/2018BRIEF FILED 
08/22/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
08/22/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/21/2018NO BRIEF FILED 
07/11/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/07/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
06/06/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
06/06/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/06/2018PDR DISPGranted
03/28/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
03/23/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/30/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStacey M. Soule
CUEVAS, JEREMY JAYAppellantTravis W. Berry
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
03-08-18 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
156th District Court 
Bee 
 
B-16-2003-0-CR-B 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site