Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0265-18    
PD-0265-18
04/12/2018
PDR Case Type
DAVENPORT, MARC 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/05/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILEDState
08/29/2018BRIEF FILEDState
08/07/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellee
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2018CCA CORRESPONDENCE SENT 
09/05/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
09/04/2018CCA CORRESPONDENCE SENT 
08/29/2018BRIEF FILED 
08/07/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/20/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
07/20/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/20/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/20/2018PDR DISPGranted
04/18/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/12/2018PDR FILED 
03/09/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
03/09/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DAVENPORT, MARCAppelleeStephen D. Jackson
STATE OF TEXASStateJoseph Robert Larsen
Christopher J. Downey
David P. Cunningham
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
02-07-18 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
221st District Court 
Montgomery 
 
16-06-07318-CR 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site