Case: PD-0264-17    
PD-0264-17
03/22/2017
PDR Case Type
SEARS, ARMAUD 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/15/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/05/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/02/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/02/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/05/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/18/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
09/14/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
09/13/2017PDR GRANTED 
09/13/2017PDR DISPGranted
04/05/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
03/22/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/15/2017AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateAngela Mann Kneeland
SEARS, ARMAUDAppellantLindsey Scott
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
01-31-17 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 
Jefferson 
 
13-17651 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site