Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0255-18    
PD-0255-18
04/12/2018
PDR Case Type
RILEY, CHARLIE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/20/2018PDR DISPGranted
04/18/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/12/2018PDR FILED 
03/08/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
03/08/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/2018STATUSAPPELLEE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASState 
RILEY, CHARLIEAPPELLEE/STATEW. Troy McKinney
Douglas Wayne Atkinson
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
02-07-18 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
221st District Court 
Montgomery 
 
16-06-07316-CR 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site