Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0254-18    
PD-0254-18
03/08/2018
PDR Case Type
DOYAL, CRAIG 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/12/2018POST SUB BR RECDAmicus Curiae
09/26/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
09/07/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
09/05/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILEDState
08/22/2018BRIEF FILEDState
07/06/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellee
05/09/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
04/24/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/2018POST SUB BR RECD 
10/03/2018SUBMITTED 
09/26/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
09/26/2018MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR 
09/18/2018MOTION DISPGranted
09/14/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
09/14/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
09/14/2018MOTION FILED 
09/13/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
09/07/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
09/05/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
09/04/2018SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
09/04/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
08/22/2018BRIEF FILED 
08/03/2018MOTION TO CONSOLIDATEGranted
08/02/2018MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 
08/02/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
08/02/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
07/06/2018BRIEF FILED 
06/06/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/06/2018PDR DISPGranted
05/09/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
04/24/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
03/15/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
03/08/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DOYAL, CRAIGAppelleeCathy Cochran
Rusty Hardin
Naomi Howard
Anthony Douglas Drumheller
STATE OF TEXASStateChristopher J. Downey
David P. Cunningham
Joseph Robert Larsen
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
02-07-18 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
221st District Court 
Montgomery 
 
16-06-07315-CR 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site