Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0244-16    
PD-0244-16
04/04/2016
PDR Case Type
ASH, ANDRE JAMMAR 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/21/2016BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
10/14/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/2017REHEAR EXT DISPGranted
07/12/2017REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
06/28/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
12/07/2016ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
12/07/2016SUBMITTED 
11/08/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
11/08/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
11/04/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
11/02/2016SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
11/02/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
10/21/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/14/2016BRIEF FILED 
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
04/13/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/04/2016PDR FILED 
03/04/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
03/04/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/14/2017STATUSREHEAR DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ASH, ANDRE JAMMARAppellantStanley L. Schwieger
STATE OF TEXASState 
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
02-04-16 
10th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court 
Falls 
 
9414 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site