Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0228-17    
PD-0228-17
03/06/2017
PDR Case Type
CORTEZ, JOSE LUIS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/01/2017AMENDED BRIEF FILEDAppellee
08/01/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellee
05/31/2017BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2018REHEAR FILED GPDR 
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
12/27/2017EXHIBITS FILED 
12/12/2017EXHIBIT ORDERED FROM TC OR COA 
10/04/2017SUBMITTED 
09/20/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
09/20/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
08/01/2017AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
08/01/2017BRIEF FILED 
06/30/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
06/30/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/23/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
05/31/2017MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR 
05/31/2017BRIEF FILED 
05/03/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
05/03/2017PDR GRANTED 
05/03/2017PDR DISPGranted
03/23/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
03/06/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
CORTEZ, JOSE LUISAppelleeQ. Todd Hatter
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
02-03-17 
7th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
108th District Court 
Potter 
 
68,587-E 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site