Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0176-18    
PD-0176-18
02/13/2018
PDR Case Type
RUIZ, JOSE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
04/25/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
04/25/2018PDR GRANTED 
04/25/2018PDR DISPGranted
03/02/2018RESPONSE WAIVED 
03/01/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
02/13/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/25/2018STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateKeri Lea Miller
RUIZ, JOSEAppelleeLarry Christopher Iles
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
01-11-18 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
25th District Court 
Gonzales 
 
34-13-B 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site