Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0163-17    
PD-0163-17
02/22/2017
PDR Case Type
HUDGINS, COBY RAY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/09/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
06/09/2017BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/2018MANDATE ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
01/24/2018OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
10/04/2017SUBMITTED 
09/20/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
09/20/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
08/09/2017BRIEF FILED 
07/10/2017EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
07/10/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/12/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
06/09/2017BRIEF FILED 
05/30/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
05/24/2017PDR GRANTED 
05/24/2017PDR DISPGranted
03/08/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
02/22/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStacey M. Soule
HUDGINS, COBY RAYAppellantLance Ray Larison
John Brandt Thorson
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
01-25-17 
12th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
124th District Court 
Gregg 
 
43,645-B 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site