Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0041-17    
PD-0041-17
02/21/2017
PDR Case Type
NISBETT, REX ALLEN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/02/2017RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/2017PDR GRANTED 
07/26/2017PDR DISPGranted
03/07/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
03/02/2017RESPONSE FILED 
02/21/2017PDR FILED 
01/18/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
01/18/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/2017STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
NISBETT, REX ALLENAppellantKristen Jernigan
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
12-15-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
26th District Court 
Williamson 
 
13-0481-K26 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site