Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0038-18    
PD-0038-18
02/02/2018
PDR Case Type
FRENCH, CODY DARUS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/18/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
06/01/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/29/2018SUBMITTED 
08/15/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
08/15/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
07/18/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/01/2018BRIEF FILED 
05/16/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
05/16/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/23/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
04/18/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
04/18/2018PDR GRANTED 
04/18/2018PDR DISPGranted
02/21/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
02/02/2018PDR FILED 
01/09/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
01/09/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FRENCH, CODY DARUSAppellantJohn Bennett
STATE OF TEXASStateBritt Lindsey
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
08-10-17 
11th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
350th District Court 
Taylor 
 
10940-D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site