Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0035-18    
PD-0035-18
01/09/2018
PDR Case Type
GARCIA, FREDDY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/05/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
05/03/2018BRIEF FILEDState
03/20/2018RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/15/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
08/15/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
07/05/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
06/27/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/08/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
06/08/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/06/2018NO BRIEF FILED 
05/03/2018BRIEF FILED 
04/11/2018PDR GRANTED 
04/11/2018PDR DISPGranted
03/20/2018RESPONSE FILED 
03/19/2018EXT RESP DISP/NFEGranted
03/19/2018EXT RESPONSE FILED 
01/30/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
01/09/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GARCIA, FREDDYAppellantCheri Lynn Duncan
STATE OF TEXASStateKathryn Davis
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
12-14-17 
14th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
174th District Court 
Harris 
 
0482220 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site