Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0005-18    
PD-0005-18
01/25/2018
PDR Case Type
LITCHFIELD, MARGARET FAYE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/04/2018BRIEF FILEDState
07/23/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/2018BRIEF FILED 
08/22/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
08/22/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
07/23/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
07/05/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
06/06/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/06/2018PDR DISPGranted
02/02/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
01/25/2018PDR FILED 
01/03/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
01/03/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASAppelleeCharles Karakashian Jr.
LITCHFIELD, MARGARET FAYEAppellantJames H. Kreimeyer
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
11/30/2017 
6th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court 
Coryell 
 
15-22720 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site