Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-77,046    
AP-77,046
09/04/2014
Appeal Case Type
SKINNER, HENRY WATKINS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/07/2018SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
08/02/2018SUPP BRIEF RECDAppellant
07/20/2018SUPP BR FILEDState
06/19/2018SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
04/13/2015SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
02/18/2015REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
01/27/2015BRIEF FILEDState
11/12/2014BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/2018SUPP BR FILED 
08/03/2018MOTION DISPGranted
08/02/2018SUPP BRIEF RECD 
08/02/2018MOTION FILED 
07/20/2018SUPP BR FILED 
06/19/2018SUPP BR FILED 
05/14/2018MOTION DISPGranted
05/11/2018MOTION FILED 
05/11/2018SUPP CR FILED 
05/09/2018SUPP CR FILED 
03/07/2018SUPP RR FILED 
01/30/2018MISC DOCUMENT RECD 
10/25/2017MISC DOCUMENT RECD 
06/15/2017MISC DOCUMENT RECD 
07/05/2016SUPP CR FILED 
06/08/2016ORDER FILEDRemanded to the Trial Court
05/23/2016MOTION FILED 
05/17/2016NOTICE TO APPEAR 
04/04/2016MANDATE ISSDAbated and remanded
03/09/2016MOTION DISPDENIED
03/09/2016OPINION ISSDAbated and remanded
03/01/2016MOTION FILED 
02/19/2016MISC DOCUMENT RECD 
09/03/2015EXHIBITS FILED 
08/20/2015ORDER FILED 
04/15/2015SUBMITTED DNA 
04/13/2015SUPP BR FILED 
04/13/2015MOTION DISPGranted
04/09/2015MOTION FILED 
03/26/2015NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/26/2015NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/24/2015NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/20/2015SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR APPEALS 
03/20/2015SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/18/2015ORDER FILED 
02/18/2015REPLY BRIEF FILED 
01/27/2015BRIEF FILED 
12/03/2014EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/03/2014EXT BRIEF FILED 
11/25/2014NOTICE TO APPEAR 
11/12/2014BRIEF FILED 
10/02/2014EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
10/02/2014EXT BRIEF FILED 
09/12/2014REPORTERS RECORD FILED 
09/12/2014CLERK'S RECORD FILED 
09/04/2014IN RE: RECORD FORMAT 
09/04/2014NOTICE OF APPEAL 
09/04/2014DP BEGIN DNA 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateKatherine D. Hayes
SKINNER, HENRY WATKINSAppellantDouglas G. Robinson
Robert C. Owen
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
31st District Court 
Gray 
Honorable Presiding Judge 31st Judicial District 
5216 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site