Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-76,936    
AP-76,936
12/31/2012
Appeal Case Type
ANDRUS, TERENCE TRAMAINE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/21/2014BRIEF FILEDState
04/22/2014BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/2016MANDATE ISSDAffirmed
03/23/2016OPINION ISSD - PRIOR OPINION WITHDRAWNMotion for Rehearing Denied
03/23/2016REHEAR DISP – DPDENIED
01/07/2016REHEAR FILED DP 
12/21/2015REHEAR EXT DISPGranted
12/18/2015REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
12/10/2015CCA CORRESPONDENCE SENT 
12/09/2015OPINION ISSDAffirmed
04/09/2015SUPP CR FILED 
02/25/2015ORDER FILEDRemanded to the Trial Court
02/25/2015ORDER FILEDRemanded to the Trial Court
02/25/2015ORDER FILEDRemanded to the Trial Court
02/25/2015ORDER FILEDRemanded to the Trial Court
02/04/2015SUBMITTED DP 
01/13/2015NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/02/2015NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
12/31/2014NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
12/29/2014NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
12/22/2014SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR APPEALS 
12/22/2014SET FOR SUBMIS 
10/21/2014BRIEF FILED 
08/21/2014EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
08/21/2014EXT BRIEF FILED 
08/12/2014MOTION DISPDENIED
08/11/2014SUPP CR FILED 
08/06/2014MOTION FILED 
05/22/2014EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
05/22/2014EXT BRIEF FILED 
04/25/2014STATEMENT FILED 
04/22/2014BRIEF FILED 
03/11/2014EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
03/04/2014EXT BRIEF FILED 
01/07/2014SUPP CR FILED 
12/09/2013EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/09/2013EXT BRIEF FILED 
11/05/2013DP BEGIN 
11/05/2013REPORTERS RECORD FILED 
11/05/2013EXT RR DISPGranted
11/05/2013EXT RR FILED 
08/26/2013EXT RR DISP/NFEGranted
08/26/2013EXT RR FILED 
07/25/2013EXT RR DISPGranted
07/24/2013EXT RR FILED 
04/15/2013EXT RR DISPGranted
04/15/2013EXT RR FILED 
01/28/2013TC APPT COUNSEL 
01/25/2013CLERK'S RECORD FILED 
01/24/2013RR RETURNED 
01/23/2013EXT RR DISPGranted
01/23/2013EXT RR FILED 
12/31/2012IN RE: RECORD FORMAT 
12/31/2012IN RE: RECORD FORMAT 
12/31/2012LETTER TO TC RE: 11.071 APPOINTMENT/RECORD 
12/31/2012TC APPT COUNSEL 
12/31/2012TC NOTICE RECEIVED 
12/31/2012DP NUMBER ASSIGNED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/2016STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS, STATE OFStateJason Bennyhoff
ANDRUS, TERENCE TRAMAINEAppellantCary M. Faden
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
240th District Court 
Fort Bend 
Honorable THOMAS R CULVER, III 
09-DCR-051034 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site