Supreme Court

Case: 18-0538    
18-0538
06/12/2018
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P. 
APACHE CORPORATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/09/2018Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
09/04/2018Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Apache Corporation.
06/12/2018Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/19/2018Petition for Review disposedDenied 
10/09/2018Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
09/12/2018MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due on October 9, 2018.
09/12/2018Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
09/04/2018Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Apache Corporation.
08/03/2018Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than September 4, 2018.  
07/03/2018Case forwarded to Court  
07/02/2018Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Apache Corporation.
06/12/2018Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
06/12/2018Court reporter/recorder's record  
06/12/2018Clerk's Record  
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/05/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. PetitionerMr. Jeffrey C. King
Mr. Stephen David Taylor
Adam L. Plumbley
Mr. Garrett S. Martin
Mr. David F. Johnson
Apache CorporationRespondentMr. Steven C. Kiser
Mr. Richard E. Booth
Mr. Harper Estes
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
550 SW3d 259, 04-30-18 
11th Court of Appeals 
Honorable John M. Bailey 
Trial Court Information
118th District Court 
Glasscock 
Honorable Timothy D. Yeats 
1695-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site