Supreme Court

Case: 18-0286    
18-0286
03/27/2018
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ROBERT R. WIGHTMAN-CERVANTES 
MIKE HERNANDEZ 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/13/2018Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/21/2018Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedMotion to Reform Defective Mandate denied.
09/20/2018Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Reform Defective Mandate filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
08/29/2018Case Stored e-stored
07/12/2018Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
06/01/2018Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/01/2018Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Dismissed 
05/01/2018Case forwarded to Court  
05/01/2018Reply to Response to Motion Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
04/30/2018Document filed (see remarks) Document Filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
04/27/2018Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Mike Hernandez.
04/27/2018Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of Mike Hernandez.
04/18/2018Miscellaneous Motion Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
04/13/2018Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
03/27/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review is due on April 10, 2018.
03/27/2018Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for respondent to determine if a response to the motion will be filed.
03/27/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Robert Wightman-Cervantes.
03/27/2018Clerk's Record  
03/27/2018Clerk's Record  
03/27/2018Clerk's Record  
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/29/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hernandez, MikeRespondentMr. Frank W. Hill
Wightman-Cervantes, Robert PetitionerMr. Robert R. (Bobby) Wightman-Cervantes
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismiss WOJ 
___ SW3d ___, 02-09-18 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel 
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan Heygood McCoy 
153-289655-16 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site