Supreme Court

Case: 17-0781    
17-0781
09/25/2017
U.S. Certified Question accepted by Supreme Court
ANN MARIE BERGIN 
MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC, ET AL. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/25/2017Certified Question filedU. S. Certified QuestionCertified Question filed by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of Ann Marie Bergin.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of P. Leigh O'Dell is granted.
10/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedEdward F. Blizzard's Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of P. Leigh O'Dell is granted.
10/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedEdward F. Blizzard's Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Allison Hunnicutt is granted.
10/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Allison Hunnicutt is granted.
10/12/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Attorney Edward F. Blizzard's Motion in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Allison Hunnicutt.
10/12/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Allison Hunnicutt.
10/12/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Attorney Edward F. Blizzard's Motion in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of P. Leigh O'Dell.
10/12/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of P. Leigh O'Dell.
10/11/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voicemail for Linda Carol at Tucker Ellis regarding filing fee.
10/11/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion in support of John Q. Lewis's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted.
10/11/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident attorney John Q. Lewis granted.
10/11/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion in support of John Q. Lewis's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/11/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident attorney John Q. Lewis filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion in support of Dustin B. Rawlin's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident Dustin B. Rawlin granted
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion in support of Benjamin Sasse's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident Benjamin Sassé granted
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion in support of Dustin B. Rawlin's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/10/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident Dustin B. Rawlin filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/06/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion in support of Benjamin Sasse's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/06/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice submitted by non resident Benjamin Sassé filed on behalf of Mentor Worldwide LLC.
10/06/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Appellant brief due no later than November 6, 2017; Appellee's brief due November 27, 2017; Reply brief due December 12, 2017.
10/06/2017Certified Question accepted  
10/06/2017Certified Question disposedCertified Question acceptedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
10/05/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voicemail for Jacqueline in Mr. Rawlin's office requesting the filing fee of $90.
09/29/2017Call received Call received from Lisa in Ms. O'Dell's office who confirmed that they are working on the motions for pro hac vice.
09/29/2017Call received Call received from Jacqueline in Mr. Rawlin's office who confirmed that they are working on the motions for pro hac vice.
09/29/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voicemail for Ms. Lindsey Smith, assistant to Ms. Leigh O'Dell, regarding motions for pro hac vice.
09/29/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voicemail for Mr. Dustin Rawlin regarding motions for pro hac vice.
09/25/2017Notice requesting filing fee Filing fee request sent to both parties.
09/25/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to appellant and appellee's counsel regarding motions for pro hac vice.
09/25/2017Case Record Filed  Case Record received from U.S. Court of Appeals Eleventh Circuit.
09/25/2017Certified Question filed Certified Question filed by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of Ann Marie Bergin.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/25/2017Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesStaff Attorney for Original Proceeding 
10/06/2017Submission (Set to be Heard)Date and time of oral argument are yet to be determined 
11/06/2017StatusAppellant brief due 
11/27/2017StatusAppellee Brief due 
12/12/2017StatusPet/Rel reply brief on the merits due 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bergin, Ann MarieAppellantMs. Kendall Dunson
Mr. Frederick B. Darley III
Mr. Edward F. Blizzard
Ms. P. Leigh O'Dell
Mr. Andy Birchfield Junior
Mr. Michael J. Crow
Ms. Allison Hunnicutt
Mr. Wesley Chadwick Cook
Mentor Worldwide LLCAppelleeMr. Benjamin Sasse
Ms. Allyson Newton Ho
Mr. John Q. Lewis
Mr. Dustin B. Rawlin
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site