Supreme Court

Case: 17-0580    
17-0580
07/20/2017
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE PAUL JOHNSON 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/21/2017Motion for RehearingRefers to Petition for Writ of MandamusMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Paul Johnson
09/27/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorReply to Real Party in Interest’s Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul Johnson.
09/25/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Bastrop Central Appraisal District.
07/20/2017Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul Johnson.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/2018Case Stored e-stored
02/09/2018Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
01/09/2018Case forwarded to Court  
12/21/2017Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Paul Johnson
12/08/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedReal Party in Interest's Motion for Sanctions denied
12/08/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedDenied 
10/06/2017Response to Motion filed Response to Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of Paul Johnson.
09/28/2017Miscellaneous Motion Real Party in Interest's Motion for Sanctions filed on behalf of Bastrop Central Appraisal District.
09/27/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Reply to Real Party in Interest’s Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul Johnson.
09/25/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Bastrop Central Appraisal District.
08/25/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than September 25, 2017.
07/25/2017Case forwarded to Court  
07/20/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul Johnson.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/09/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Johnson, Paul RelatorMr. Paul Johnson
Bastrop County Appraisal DistrictReal Party in Interest Ms. Yessika M. Monagas
Mr. D. Kirk Swinney
Mr. Ryan L. James
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 06-09-17 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable David E. Puryear 
Trial Court Information
335th District Court 
 
Honorable Reva L. Towslee Corbett 
223-335 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site