Supreme Court

Case: 17-0509    
17-0509
06/27/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
TEXAS OUTFITTERS LIMITED, LLC 
CAROLYN GRACE NICHOLSON, WILLIAM LUTHER CARTER, JR., AND DORA JO CARTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GENERAL PARTNER OF CARTER RANCH, LTD. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/2018Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
05/01/2018Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolyn Grace Nicholson, et al.
03/28/2018Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
12/14/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
11/15/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carolyn Grace Nicholson, et al.
09/11/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the State of Texas in Support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Andrew B. Davis, Assistant Solicitor General of the Office of the Attorney General, Austin Texas.
09/01/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/29/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 10, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/15/2018Petition for Review granted  
06/15/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/30/2018Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
05/09/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due no later than May 30, 2018.
05/07/2018Electronic communication received from Party Email from Mr. Tom Joseph stating respondent will not be filing a written response in opposition to the motion for extension of time to file reply brief on the merits.
05/07/2018Electronic communication received from Party Email sent to respondent to determine if a written response in opposition will be filed.
05/07/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
05/01/2018Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolyn Grace Nicholson, et al.
04/10/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits is granted. Response brief is due May 1, 2018. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due May 16, 2018.
04/10/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolyn Grace Nicholson, et al.
03/28/2018Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
03/21/2018Call received Call received from Deborah Williams regarding an exhibit missing from the record.
02/13/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Petitioner's brief is due March 28, 2018. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due April 17, 2018; Reply brief is due May 2, 2018.
02/13/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
02/02/2018Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/29/2018Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
01/26/2018Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than February 26, 2018; Response brief due March 19, 2018; Reply brief due April 3, 2018.
12/14/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
11/20/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due December 14, 2017.
11/20/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
11/15/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Carolyn Grace Nicholson, et al.
10/20/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 20, 2017.
09/19/2017Case forwarded to Court  
09/13/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Grace Nicholson, et al.
09/11/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the State of Texas in Support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Andrew B. Davis, Assistant Solicitor General of the Office of the Attorney General, Austin Texas.
09/05/2017Call received Received phone call of legal assistant of counsel William Powers regarding the petition for review.
09/05/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Contacted petitioner's counsel regarding the error message, via the e-Filing system, of the petition for review.
09/01/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
08/29/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance - William Powers will serve as lead attorney filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited.
07/25/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due September 1, 2017.
07/25/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
06/27/2017Certification (various) in case received Amended Certificate of Conference for Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
06/27/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due August 2, 2017.
06/27/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted respondents' counsel to determine whether they are opposed, or unopposed, to petitioner's requested extension. Per Mr. Joseph, they do not oppose.
06/27/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petiton for Review filed on behalf of Texas Outfitters Limited, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/10/2018Submission (Set to be Heard)Submission (Set to be heard) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carter, William Luther (Individually And As General Partner Of Carter Ranch, Ltd.) RespondentMs. Anne Joseph-Carraway  
Texas Outfitters Limited, LLCPetitionerMr. Adam W. Aston
Mr. William Powers Jr.
Mr. Peter Carl Hansen
Mr. Sean D. Jordan
Ms. Danica Lynn Milios
The State of TexasAmicus CuriaeAtty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. J. Campbell Barker
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Andrew B. Davis
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Carter, Dora Jo (Individually And As General Partner Of Carter Ranch, Ltd.) RespondentMs. Anne Joseph-Carraway  
Nicholson, Carolyn (Individually And As General Partner Of Carter Ranch, Ltd.) RespondentMr. Thomas E. Joseph
Ms. Anne Joseph-Carraway  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
534 SW3d 65, 05-17-17 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Luz Elena D Chapa 
Trial Court Information
81st District Court 
 
Honorable Donna S. Rayes 
11-06-00215-CVF 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site