Supreme Court

Case: 17-0450    
17-0450
06/07/2017
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
HARTMAN NEWSPAPERS, LP D/B/A FORT BEND HERALD AND TEXAS COASTER 
TROY E. NEHLS, SHERIFF, AND FORT BEND COUNTY, TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/18/2018Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
03/14/2018Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
02/27/2018Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Troy E. Nehls, et al.
02/07/2018Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
10/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief of the Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of petitioner submitted by Joseph R. Larsen of Sedgwick LLP of Houston, Texas.
10/13/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers.
10/04/2017Amended Petition for Review filedPetitionerAmended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
09/28/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Troy E. Nehls, et al.
07/12/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/19/2018Case forwarded to Court  
06/18/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
06/01/2018Petition for Review disposedDenied 
03/14/2018Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
02/27/2018Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Troy E. Nehls, et al.
02/07/2018Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
12/18/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record recevied.
12/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is due on February 7, 2018. Respondent's Brief on the Merits is due on February 27, 2018. Reply Brief on the Merits is due on March 14, 2018.
12/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
12/11/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
12/08/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 8, 2018; Response brief due January 29, 2018; Reply brief due February 13, 2018.
10/31/2017Adoption by another party of brief already filed Amici The Dallas Morning News, Inc., Denton Record Chronicle, The E.W. Scripps Company, Fox Television Stations, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Moser Community Media, LLC, Southern Newspapers, Inc., Austin American-Statesman, TEGNA Inc., Voice Media Group, Texas Association of Broadcasters, and the Texas Press Association joins as additional amici curiae in support of the Amicus Curiae Brief of Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas.
10/27/2017Motion to Amend disposedFiling grantedPetitioner's Motion to Amend Petition for Review granted
10/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the Freedom of Information Foundation of Texas in support of petitioner submitted by Joseph R. Larsen of Sedgwick LLP of Houston, Texas.
10/13/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers.
10/04/2017Motion to Amend Filed Motion to Amend Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
10/04/2017Amended Petition for Review filed Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
09/28/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Troy E. Nehls, et al.
09/01/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than October 2, 2017.
08/01/2017Case forwarded to Court  
07/26/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf Fort Bend County, Texas, et al.
07/12/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
06/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due July 12, 2017.
06/07/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hartman Newspapers, LP.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/19/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesUnder Review 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fort Bend County, TexasRespondentMr. Randall W. Morse
Mr. Roy L. Cordes Jr.
Mr. Kevin T. Hedges
Mr. Matthew L. Grove
Freedom of Information Foundation of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Joseph R. Larsen
Hartman Newspapers, LP d/b/a Fort Bend Herald and Texas Coaster PetitionerMs. Brittany W. Cope
Mr. Richard L. Tate
Ms. Elizabeth B. 'Libby' King
Gannett Co., Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Catherine Lewis Robb
Ms. Laura Lee Prather  
Texas Press AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Catherine Lewis Robb
Ms. Laura Lee Prather  
Moser Community Media LLCAmicus CuriaeMs. Catherine Lewis Robb
Ms. Laura Lee Prather  
The E.W. Scripps CompanyAmicus CuriaeMs. Laura Lee Prather  
Ms. Catherine Lewis Robb
Troy E. Nehls, SheriffRespondentMr. Roy L. Cordes Jr.
Mr. Randall W. Morse
Mr. Matthew L. Grove
Mr. Kevin T. Hedges
Fox Television Stations, LLCAmicus CuriaeMs. Laura Lee Prather  
Ms. Catherine Lewis Robb
Texas Association of BroadcastersAmicus CuriaeMs. Laura Lee Prather  
Ms. Catherine Lewis Robb
Austin American-StatesmanAmicus CuriaeMr. James A. Hemphill
Voice Media GroupAmicus CuriaeMr. James A. Hemphill
Denton Record ChronicleAmicus CuriaeMr. Paul C. Watler
The Dallas Morning News, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Paul C. Watler
TEGNA Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Laura Lee Prather  
Ms. Catherine Lewis Robb
Southern Newspapers, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Laura Lee Prather  
Ms. Catherine Lewis Robb
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
522 SW3d 23, 04-27-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rebeca Aizpuru Huddle 
Trial Court Information
240th District Court 
 
Honorable Thomas R. Culver 
15-DCV-225813 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site