Supreme Court

Case: 17-0437    
17-0437
06/05/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
TIMOTHY CASTLEMAN AND CASTLEMAN CONSULTING, LLC 
INTERNET MONEY LIMITED AND KEVIN O'CONNOR 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/01/2018Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Thomas B. Cowart.
01/02/2018Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
12/13/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
09/20/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
09/05/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Internet Money Limited, et al.
06/23/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/19/2018Case Stored e-stored
06/08/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/01/2018Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Thomas B. Cowart.
04/27/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/27/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed and remanded to Court of AppealsPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. Per Curiam Opinion
(4/27/2018 1:29:42 PM) 170437.pdf, 17-0437.jmt.pdf
04/27/2018Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
04/27/2018Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
01/02/2018Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
12/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits granted. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED. Petitioner's Brief was filed in our Office on December 13, 2017; Response Brief due January 2, 2018; Reply Brief due January 17, 2017.
12/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
12/13/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
11/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due on December 5, 2017. Response Brief is due on December 27, 2017. Reply Brief is due on January 11, 2018.
11/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
10/25/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/23/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
10/20/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than November 20, 2017; Response brief due December 11, 2017; Reply brief due December 27, 2017.
09/20/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
09/05/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Internet Money Limited, et al.
08/04/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response Requested to Petition for Review due no later than September 5, 2017.
07/05/2017Case forwarded to Court  
06/27/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Internet Money Limited, et al.
06/26/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review was filed on June 23, 2017.
06/23/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
06/23/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
06/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due June 20, 2017.
06/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timothy Castleman, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/19/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Castleman, TimothyPetitionerMr. Jared B. Hall
Mr. Leif A. Olson
O'Connor, KevinRespondentMs. Anna M.W. McKim
Mr. J. Paul Manning
Internet Money LimitedRespondentMs. Anna M.W. McKim
Mr. J. Paul Manning
Castleman Consultng, LLCPetitionerMr. Jared B. Hall
Mr. Leif A. Olson
Cowart, ThomasAmicus CuriaeMr. Thomas B. 'Tom' Cowart
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
545 SW3d 682, 04-19-17 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Brian P. Quinn 
Trial Court Information
237th District Court 
 
Honorable Leslie F. 'Les' Hatch 
2016-519,740 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site