Supreme Court

Case: 17-0395    
17-0395
05/19/2017
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE CAROLINA GARZA 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/21/2017Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
11/15/2017Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of UV Logistics, LLC and Alex Rodriguez.
10/26/2017Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
08/15/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorReply in support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
07/21/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of UV Logistics, LLC, et al.
05/19/2017Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/2018Case Stored e-stored
05/24/2018Certified cys of cost bill sent to attys of record Cost Bill Issued
04/13/2018Opinion issuedWrit of Mandamus conditionally granted Pursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 52.8(c), without hearing oral argument, the Court conditionally grants the writ of mandamus.  Per Curiam Opinion
(4/13/2018 5:22:27 PM) 170395.pdf
04/13/2018Mandamus granted pursuant to TRAP 52.8  
04/13/2018Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 52.8(c) 
04/13/2018Stay Order lifted Stay order issued August 29, 2017 is lifted.
12/21/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
12/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply brief is due December 21, 2017.
12/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
11/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply brief is due December 11, 2017.
11/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file her Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
11/15/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of UV Logistics, LLC and Alex Rodriguez.
10/26/2017Brief on the Merits Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
10/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Relator's brief is due October 26, 2017; Real Party in Interest's brief is due November 15, 2017; and Reply brief is due November 30, 2017.
10/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
10/11/2017Call received From Mr. Matt Kita in re:  not going to be able to make the deadline of 10/12/17 for his relator's brief on the merits.
09/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Relator's brief is due October 12, 2017; Real party's brief is due November 1, 2017; Reply brief is due November 16, 2017.
09/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
08/29/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits request:  Relator's brief due no later than September 28, 2017; Response brief due October 18, 2017; Reply brief due November 2, 2017.
08/29/2017Stay Order issued  
08/29/2017Motion to Stay DisposedFiling grantedRelator's Motion for Emergency Temporary Relief granted
08/15/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Reply in support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
07/21/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of UV Logistics, LLC, et al.
07/21/2017Case Record Filed  Record filed on behalf of Alex Rodriguez, et al.
07/18/2017Call received Call received from counsel for Real Party in Interest regarding due date for response.
07/17/2017Amendment to Motion filed  Amended Motion for Emergency Relief filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
07/07/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than August 7, 2017.
06/26/2017Motion to Stay Filed  Motion for Emergency Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
05/30/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/19/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Carolina Garza.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/15/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garza, Carolina RelatorMr. Michael A. Hatchell
Mr. Jeffery E. Pratt
Mr. Matthew J. Kita
Mr. Brian E. Gillette
Rodriguez, AlexReal Party in Interest Mr. Douglas E. Chaves
Ms. Audrey Mullert Vicknair
UV Logistics, LLC Real Party in Interest Ms. Audrey Mullert Vicknair
Mr. M. David Frock
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 03-29-17 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
79th District Court 
 
Honorable Richard Clark Terrell 
14-05-53192-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site