Supreme Court

Case: 17-0329    
17-0329
04/28/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS 
LORI ANNAB 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Association of Counties in support of petitioner. Submitted by Garry A. Merritt, General Counsel of TAC of Austin, Texas.
02/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General of the Texas Attorney General's Office, Austin Texas.
12/20/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Texas Municipal League, et al.  Submitted by Ramon G. Viada, III,  with Viada & Strayer of The Woodlands, Texas.
12/07/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
11/22/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
10/02/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
06/28/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
05/30/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/11/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/11/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/reversed in part/rendered The Court affirms in part and reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Justice Blacklock delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/11/2018 3:41:48 PM) 170329.pdf, 17-0329.jmt.pdf
03/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Association of Counties in support of petitioner. Submitted by Garry A. Merritt, General Counsel of TAC of Austin, Texas.
03/01/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Seth Hopkins; Argued on behalf of respondent by Steve E. Couch; Argued on behalf of amicus curiae by Scott A. Keller
02/20/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form received on behalf of Amicus Curiae, the State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Scott A. Keller of the Office of the Attorney General.
02/16/2018Response to Motion filed Response to Motion of Amicus Curiae The State of Texas to Participate in Oral Argument filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
02/16/2018Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion of Amicus Curiae The State of Texas to Participate in Oral Argument granted.  Time allotted to argue: 15/20/5 minutes.
02/14/2018Miscellaneous Motion Motion to Participate in Oral Argument filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General of the Texas Attorney General's Office, Austin Texas.
01/23/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Lori Annab. Oral Argument will be presented by Steve E. Couch of Kelly, Sutter & Kendrick, P.C. of Houston, Texas.
01/22/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Harris County. Oral Argument will be presented by Seth Hopkins of the Harris County Attorney's Office of Houston, Texas.
01/19/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 1, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/19/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/19/2018Petition for Review granted  
12/20/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Texas Municipal League, et al.  Submitted by Ramon G. Viada, III,  with Viada & Strayer of The Woodlands, Texas.
12/07/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
11/22/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
10/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due November 22, 2017; and Reply brief is due December 7, 2017.
10/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
10/03/2017Call received Respondent will be filing a motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits.
10/02/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
09/14/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/05/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
07/05/2017Case forwarded to Court  
06/28/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
05/30/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
05/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due May 30, 2017.
05/01/2017Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review Response to Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lori Annab.
05/01/2017Call received Call received from the office of Mr. Powers regarding the filing fee.
05/01/2017Electronic communication received from Party Mr. Couch will file a written response to petitioner's motion for extenison of time to file petition for review no later than tomorrow.
05/01/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. Powers regarding filing fee.
05/01/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. Steve Couch to determine if respondent will be filing a written response in opposition to motion for extension of time to file petition for review.
04/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extenison of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Harris County, Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/29/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Busick, PhD, Carole Other interested party Mr. Michael W. Blaise
Mr. Scott Benjamin Novak
The Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Ramon G. Viada III
Harris CountyPetitionerMr. Seth B. Hopkins
Mr. B. Jorey Herrscher
Mr. Vincent R. Ryan Jr.
Mr. Bruce S. Powers
Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Ramon G. Viada III
Annab, LoriRespondentMr. Steven E. Couch
Caplan, Kenneth Other interested party Mr. Kenneth Caplan
Texas Association of CountiesAmicus CuriaeKatherine Wells Howard
Garry Anthony Merritt
The State of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Scott A. Keller
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
524 SW3d 793, 03-14-17 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Marc W. Brown 
Trial Court Information
165th District Court 
 
Honorable Debra Ibarra Mayfield 
2015-58707 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site