Supreme Court

Case: 17-0323    
17-0323
04/25/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE STATE OF TEXAS 
T.S.N. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Department of Public Safety in support of petitioner submitted by John C. Sullivan of the Office of the Attorney General.
11/13/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T.S.N.
10/19/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
08/09/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of T.S.N.
06/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Department of Public Safety submitted by Daniel Olds of Austin, Texas.
04/25/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/11/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/11/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment.  Justice Johnson delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/11/2018 3:34:06 PM) 170323.pdf, 17-0323.jmt.pdf
03/01/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Andrea L. Westerfeld; Argued on behalf of respondent by Morgan A. McPheeters; Argued on behalf of amicus curiae by John C. Sullivan
02/23/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, T.S.N. Oral Argument will be presented by Morgan A. McPheeters of Kelly, Durham & Pittard, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
02/22/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Texas Department of Public Safety. Oral Argument will be presented by John C. Sullivan of the Office of the Attorney General.
02/21/2018Motion to Argue disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Leave for Amicus Curiae to Share Argument granted.  Time allotted to argue:  15/20/5 minutes
02/16/2018Motion to Argue filed Motion for Leave for Amicus Curiae to Share Argument filed on behalf of TDPS.
02/15/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Department of Public Safety in support of petitioner submitted by John C. Sullivan of the Office of the Attorney General.
02/05/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of the State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Andrea L. Westerfeld, Special Prosecutor of the Collin County Criminal District Attorney Office of McKinney Texas.
01/19/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 1, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/19/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/19/2018Petition for Review granted  
11/13/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of T.S.N.
10/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
10/05/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/22/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
09/22/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 23, 2017; Response brief due November 13, 2017; Reply brief due November 28, 2017
08/09/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of T.S.N.
07/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due August 9, 2017.
07/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of T.S.N.
06/30/2017Letter Filed Letter filed by Daniel Olds regarding new counsel for Amicus Curiae, Texas Department of Public Safety.
06/30/2017Call received Spoke with Jeanine Hudson regarding appearance of new lead counsel; confirmed that Daniel Olds will no longer receive notice on this case.
06/30/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Jeanine C. Hudson as new lead counsel submitted on behalf of Texas Department of Public Safety.
06/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Department of Public Safety submitted by Daniel Olds of Austin, Texas.
06/09/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than July 10, 2017.
05/09/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/04/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of T.S.N.
04/25/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/29/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Public SafetyAmicus CuriaeMr. John C. Sullivan
Ms. Jeanine C. Hudson
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Daniel J. Olds
N., T. S.RespondentMr. Jeremy F. Rosenthal
Ms. Morgan A. McPheeters
Mr. Thad D. Spalding
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesPetitionerMr. Gregory A. Willis
Mr. John R. Rolater Jr.
Ms. Andrea L. Westerfeld
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
523 SW3d 171, 02-22-17 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable David J. Schenck 
Trial Court Information
366th District Court 
 
Honorable Raymond Wheless 
366-02723-2015 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site