Supreme Court

Case: 17-0231    
17-0231
03/24/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 
MICHAEL PASKO AND PEGGY PASKO 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/21/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
11/08/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael Pasko, et al.
10/02/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
06/30/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerRelpy in Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
06/26/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Peggy Pasko and Michael Pasko.
03/24/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/2018Case Stored e-stored
05/24/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/13/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/13/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed, trial court judgment reinstatedPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and reinstates the trial court's judgment. Per Curiam Opinion
(4/16/2018 9:16:46 AM) 170231.pdf, 17-0231.jmt.pdf
04/13/2018Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
04/13/2018Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
11/21/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
11/08/2017Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael Pasko, et al.
10/25/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due November 8, 2017; and Reply brief is due November 27, 2017.
10/25/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Michael Pasko, et al.
10/02/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
09/14/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/05/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
06/30/2017Reply to Response Relpy in Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
06/26/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Peggy Pasko and Michael Pasko.
05/26/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than June 26, 2017.
04/25/2017Case forwarded to Court  
04/24/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Michael Pasko and Peggy Pasko.
03/24/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/15/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Schlumberger Technology CorporationPetitionerMr. Michael G. Terry
Mr. John Reid Simpson
Pasko, PeggyRespondentMs. Nicole Denise Lodde
Mr. Gilbert James Martinez
Pasko, MichaelRespondentMr. Gilbert James Martinez
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
542 SW3d 671, 12-08-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Nora Longoria 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
 
Honorable Kemper Stephen Williams 
15-05-23,404A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site