Supreme Court

Case: 17-0201    
17-0201
03/13/2017
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
GRACE VIRGINIA HIGGINS 
EDWIN DEAN HIGGINS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edwin Dean Higgins.
04/12/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Grace Virginia Higgins.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/13/2017Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedDenied 
06/06/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Edwin Dean Higgins.
05/19/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than June 19, 2017.
04/18/2017Case forwarded to Court  
04/17/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Edwin Dean Higgins.
04/12/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Grace Virginia Higgins.
03/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due April 12, 2017.
03/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Grace Virginia Higgins.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/13/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Higgins, Grace VirginiaPetitionerMr. M. Patrick Maguire
Higgins, Edwin DeanRespondentMr. Glenn J. Deadman
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev/Pt 
514 SW3d 382, 01-25-17 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sandee Bryan Marion 
Trial Court Information
198th District Court 
 
Honorable Melvin Rex Emerson 
09-1195-B 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site