Supreme Court

Case: 17-0197    
17-0197
03/13/2017
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE PAUL & CYNTHIA ELIZONDO AND EAGLE FABRICATORS, INC. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of the State Bar of Texas Appellate Section submitted by Elizabeth G. Bloch of Husch Blackwell, LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/07/2017Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul & Cynthia Elizondo, et al.
11/22/2017Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&O Homebuilders, Inc., et al.
09/29/2017Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul and Cynthia Elizondo and Eagle Fabricators, Inc.
08/08/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorReply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul & Cynthia Elizondo.
06/21/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of M & O Homebuilders, Inc., et al.
03/13/2017Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul and Cynthia Elizondo and Eagle Fabricators, Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/2018Opinion issuedDeniedPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 52.8(c), without hearing oral argument, the Court denies the writ of mandamus. Per Curiam Opinion
(4/13/2018 4:58:59 PM) 170197.pdf
04/13/2018Mandamus granted pursuant to TRAP 52.8  
04/13/2018Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 52.8(c) 
12/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of the State Bar of Texas Appellate Section submitted by Elizabeth G. Bloch of Husch Blackwell, LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/07/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul & Cynthia Elizondo, et al.
11/22/2017Brief on the Merits Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&O Homebuilders, Inc., et al.
10/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interests' Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Real Party in Interests' brief is due November 22, 2017; and Reply brief is due December 7, 2017.
10/19/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of M&O Homebuilders, Inc.
09/29/2017Brief on the Merits Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Paul and Cynthia Elizondo and Eagle Fabricators, Inc.
09/21/2017Motion to withdraw disposed ofFiling grantedCounsel for Real Parties in Interest's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw granted
09/11/2017Motion to Withdraw Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Real Parties in Interest submitted by The Cromeens Law Firm, PLLC and Karalynn Cromeens.
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Relator's brief on the merits due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
08/08/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus granted.  Reply is due August 8, 2017.
08/08/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul and Cynthia Elizondo, et al.
08/08/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Mr. Robert Gilbreath requesting a motion for extension of time to file reply in support of mandamus.
08/08/2017Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul & Cynthia Elizondo.
06/28/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply is due August 7, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will not be considered.
06/28/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Eagle Fabricators, Inc., et al.
06/21/2017Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of M & O Homebuilders, Inc., et al.
05/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due June 21, 2017.
05/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of M & O Homebuilders, Inc., et al.
04/21/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than May 22, 2017.
04/12/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of real parties in interest, M&O Homebuilders, Inc., Orlando Cuello, Maria De Jesus Gamez and Texas Homebuilders, LLC.
03/21/2017Case forwarded to Court  
03/13/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Paul and Cynthia Elizondo and Eagle Fabricators, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/30/2018StatusMotion for rehearing due to be filed.  
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eagle Fabricators, Inc.,RelatorMr. Robert B. Gilbreath
Mr. Ryan C. Hale
Mr. R. Scott Wolfrom
Mr. R. Kelly Donaldson
De Jesus Gamez, Maria Real Party in Interest Maria De Jesus Gamez
Ms. Linda Johnson White
Ms. Nicole Killgore
Ms. Rhonda L. Allen
Ms. Karalynn C. Cromeens
Elizondo, PaulRelatorMr. Ryan C. Hale
Elizondo, CynthiaRelatorMr. Ryan C. Hale
Texas Homebuilders, LLCReal Party in Interest Maria De Jesus Gamez
Ms. Nicole Killgore
Ms. Karalynn C. Cromeens
Ms. Rhonda L. Allen
Ms. Linda Johnson White
M&O Homebuilders, Inc.Real Party in Interest Ms. Nicole Killgore
Maria De Jesus Gamez
Ms. Linda Johnson White
Ms. Rhonda L. Allen
Ms. Karalynn C. Cromeens
State Bar of Texas Appellate SectionAmicus CuriaeMs. Elizabeth G. Bloch
Cuello, Orlando Real Party in Interest Ms. Linda Johnson White
Ms. Nicole Killgore
Ms. Rhonda L. Allen
Ms. Karalynn C. Cromeens
Orlando Cuello
Court of Appeals Information:
Cond Granted 
516 SW3d 101, 02-02-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Harvey G. Brown 
Trial Court Information
190th District Court 
 
Honorable Patricia J. Kerrigan 
2014-07209 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site