Supreme Court

Case: 17-0146    
17-0146
02/21/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BOSQUE DISPOSAL SYSTEMS, LLC, AGNUS SWD SERVICES, L.P., GORDON SWD SERVICES, L.P., AND BOB PHILLIPS D/B/A PHILLIPS WATER HAULING 
PARKER COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/18/2018Motion for RehearingPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
11/09/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerSupplemental Authority filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
11/07/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
10/23/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Parker County Appraisal District.
10/02/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
07/19/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Parker County Appraisal District.
03/15/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/19/2018Case forwarded to Court  
06/18/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
06/11/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due no later than June 18, 2018.
06/11/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
05/25/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/25/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed/remanded to trial courtThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Blacklock delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/25/2018 4:41:56 PM) 170146.pdf, 17-0146.jmt.pdf
02/28/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Joshua W. Carden; Argued on behalf of respondent by Braden W. Metcalf
01/25/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Park County Appraisal District. Oral Argument will be presented by Braden W. Metcalf of Nichols, Jackson, Dillar, Hager & Smith, LLP.
01/19/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Joshua W. Carden of Irving, Texas.
01/19/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 28, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/19/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/19/2018Petition for Review granted  
11/09/2017Additional citations received. Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
11/07/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
10/23/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Parker County Appraisal District.
10/13/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/02/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
09/06/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
07/19/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Parker County Appraisal District.
06/15/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due on July 19, 2017.
06/15/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Parker County Appraisal District.
05/19/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than June 19, 2017.
04/18/2017Case forwarded to Court  
03/15/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due March 15, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bosque Disposal Systems, LLC, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/18/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bob Phillips d/b/a Phillips Water HaulingPetitionerMr. Joshua W. Carden
Agnus SWD Services, L.P.PetitionerMr. Joshua W. Carden
Bosque Disposal Systems, LLCPetitionerMr. Joshua W. Carden
Parker County Appraisal DistrictRespondentMr. Braden W. Metcalf
Mr. Peter G. Smith
Ms. Victoria W. Thomas
Gordon SWD Services. L.P.PetitionerMr. Joshua W. Carden
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
506 SW3d 665, 12-01-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sue Walker 
Trial Court Information
415TH DISTRICT COURT 
 
Honorable Graham Quisenberry 
CV12-1573 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site