Supreme Court

Case: 17-0130    
17-0130
02/13/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
TEXAS WORKFORCE COMMISSION 
WICHITA COUNTY, TEXAS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/26/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund.  Submitted by Jennifer A. Powell with Eichelbaum Wardell Hansen Powell & Mehl, P.C. of Austin, Texas.
12/07/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
10/23/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Wichita County, Texas.
10/02/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
06/07/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Texas Workforce Commission.
05/23/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Wichita County, Texas.
03/23/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/24/2018Case Stored e-stored
07/06/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/25/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/25/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Justice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court.  
(5/25/2018 4:29:28 PM) 170130.pdf, 17-0130.jmt.pdf
02/28/2018Submission Schedule  
02/28/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Evan S. Greene; Argued on behalf of respondent by Meredith L. Kennedy
02/26/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund.  Submitted by Jennifer A. Powell with Eichelbaum Wardell Hansen Powell & Mehl, P.C. of Austin, Texas.
02/01/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Wichita County. Oral Argument will be presented by Meredith L. Kennedy of Wichita County Disctrict Attorney Office of Whichita Falls, Texas.
02/01/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Texas Workforce Commission. Oral Argument will be presented by Evan. S. Greene of the Office of the Texas Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
01/19/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 28, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/19/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/19/2018Petition for Review granted  
12/07/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
11/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due December 7, 2017.
10/30/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
10/23/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Wichita County, Texas.
10/13/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
10/02/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
09/06/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
06/07/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Texas Workforce Commission.
05/30/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/23/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Wichita County, Texas.
04/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response is due May 24, 2017.
04/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Wichita County, Texas.
03/23/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
02/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due March 23, 2017.
02/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Workforce Commission.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/24/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Workforce CommissionPetitionerMr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Peter E. Laurie  
Mr. Scott Keller
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Evan S. Greene
Mr. Robert B. O'Keefe
Wichita County, TexasRespondentMs. Anna Skupin
Mr. Andrew F. Wipke
Ms. Maureen Shelton
Ms. Meredith L. Kennedy
Mr. John Roger Gillespie
Texas Association of School Board Legal Assistance FundAmicus CuriaeMs. Jennifer A. Powell
Mr. Eric Enoch Munoz
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
507 SW3d 919, 12-08-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Terrie Livingston 
Trial Court Information
30th District Court 
 
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton 
176,514-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site