Supreme Court

Case: 17-0103    
17-0103
02/03/2017
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CHRISTOPHER HOSKINS 
PERRY FUCHS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/08/2018Reply BriefPetitioner's Reply BriefReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
12/06/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
10/16/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
06/22/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to the Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
06/07/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
02/03/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/29/2018Notice sent to Court of Appeals  
02/16/2018Petition for Review disposedDenied 
01/08/2018Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
12/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply brief is due January 8, 2018.
12/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
12/06/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
10/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due December 6, 2017; and Reply brief is due December 21, 2017.
10/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
10/16/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
10/13/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's brief is due October 16, 2017; Response brief is due November 6, 2017; Reply brief is due November 21, 2017.
09/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
09/06/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 2nd COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
07/20/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of Counsel, Lindsey M. Rames, filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
06/22/2017Reply to Response Reply to the Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
06/07/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
04/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response is due June 7, 2017.
04/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
04/07/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than May 8, 2017.
03/07/2017Case forwarded to Court  
03/01/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Perry Fuchs.
02/03/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Christopher Hoskins.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/29/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fuchs, PerryRespondentMr. Gregory A. Eyster
Mr. Hunter Ross Cox
Mr. Frank W. Hill
Hoskins, ChristopherPetitionerMr. Ross B. Russell
Mr. Carter L. Hampton
Ms. Lindsey M. Rames  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
517 SW3d 834, 12-22-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Anne Gardner 
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan Heygood McCoy 
153-280594-15 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site