Supreme Court

Case: 17-0062    
17-0062
01/26/2017
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
JODY JAMES FARMS, JV 
THE ALTMAN GROUP, INC. AND LAURIE DIAZ 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/05/2018Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
12/12/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al.
11/21/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
07/24/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al.
02/27/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/21/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
05/11/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/11/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment, vacates the arbitration award, and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Guzman delivered the opinion of the Court.  (Justice Johnson not sitting)
(5/11/2018 3:25:41 PM) 170062.pdf, 17-0062.jmt.pdf
03/20/2018Submission Schedule  
03/20/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Jody D. Jenkins; Argued on behalf of respondent by Anna McKim.  (Justice Johnson not sitting)
02/28/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of petitioner, Jody James Farms, JV. Oral Argument will be presented by Jody D. Jenkins of Jenkins, Wagnon and Young, P.C. of Lubbock, Texas.
02/28/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Anna McKim of Field, Manning, Stone, Hawthorne & Aycock, P.C.
02/16/2018Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., March 20, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes  (Justice Johnson not sitting)
02/16/2018Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
02/16/2018Petition for Review granted  
01/09/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. Reply brief was filed on January 5, 2018.
01/09/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
01/08/2018Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. Jody Jenkins requesting motion for extension of time to file reply brief on the merits.
01/05/2018Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
12/12/2017Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al.
11/21/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
10/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Petitioner's brief is due November 22, 2017. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response brief is due December 12, 2017; Reply brief is due December 27, 2017.
10/18/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
10/05/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/22/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 7th COA
09/22/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the Merits Requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than October 23, 2017; Response brief due November 13, 2017; Reply brief due November 28, 2017
07/24/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al.
06/30/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due July 24, 2017.
06/29/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to petitioner's counsel inquiring whether a response to the motion for extension of time will be filed.
06/29/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of The Altman Group, Inc., et al.
06/02/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than July 3, 2017.
04/04/2017Case forwarded to Court  
02/27/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
01/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition for Review is due February 27, 2017.
01/26/2017Electronic communication received from Party Email received from Ms. Anna McKim stating that Respondents will not file a response to the motion for extension of time request.
01/26/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Respondents' counsel inquiring whether a response to the motion will be filed.
01/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Jody James Farms, JV.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/21/2018StatusCase to be stored 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Altman Group, Inc.RespondentMs. Anna M.W. McKim
Mr. J. Paul Manning
Jody James Farms, JVPetitionerMr. Jody D. Jenkins
Diaz, LaurieRespondentMr. J. Paul Manning
Ms. Anna M.W. McKim
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
506 SW3d 595, 10-17-16 
7th Court of Appeals 
Honorable James T. Campbell 
Trial Court Information
110th District Court 
Floyd 
Honorable William Paul Smith 
10,422 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site