Case: 17-0052    
17-0052
01/23/2017
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LAURA PRESSLEY 
GREGORIO (GREG) CASAR 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/22/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of The Texas Association of Counties, in support of respondent, Gregorio (Greg) Casar, submitted by Garry A. Merritt and Paul O. Miles of Austin, Texas.
04/09/2018Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gregorio Casar.
02/16/2018Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBrief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
09/21/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter submitted on behalf of Carl Haddick of Austin, Texas.
09/19/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Attorney General Ken Paxton in support of petitioner submitted by Brantley Starr and Michael C. Toth.
09/18/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of the Libertarian Party of Texas in support of petitioner submitted by Thomas G. Glass of Election Integrity Committee of the Libertarian Party of Texas of Hockley, Texas.
09/12/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
08/08/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gregorio (Greg) Casar.
04/07/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of The Texas Association of Counties, in support of respondent, Gregorio (Greg) Casar, submitted by Garry A. Merritt and Paul O. Miles of Austin, Texas.
05/22/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Reply brief is due June 22, 2018.
05/21/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
04/16/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.  Reply Brief is due no later than May 24, 2018.
04/13/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
04/09/2018Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gregorio Casar.
03/02/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due April 9, 2018; Reply Brief is due April 24, 2018.
03/02/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gregorio “Greg” Casar.
02/16/2018Brief on the Merits Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
01/24/2018Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
01/11/2018Call received Call received from Mr. Kuhn asking about the language "No further extensions of time will be considered." The notice should say "No further extensions of time for this filing will be considered."
01/11/2018Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 3rd COA
01/10/2018Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. No further extensions of time will be considered.  Petitioner's brief is due February 16, 2018; Respondent's brief is due March 8, 2018; and Reply brief is due March 23, 2018.
01/09/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
12/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due January 17, 2018; Response Brief is due February 6, 2018; Reply Brief is due February 21, 2018.
12/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laura Presley.
11/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than December 18, 2017; Response brief due January 8, 2018; Reply brief due January 23, 2018.
11/15/2017Letter Filed Letter in response to referral to Pro Bono Program filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
10/20/2017Referral to Pro Bono Program - Letter sent to All Counsel of Record and Program Liason Referral to Pro Bono Program sent to parties and liaison.
09/21/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter submitted on behalf of Carl Haddick of Austin, Texas.
09/19/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Attorney General Ken Paxton in support of petitioner submitted by Brantley Starr and Michael C. Toth.
09/18/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of the Libertarian Party of Texas in support of petitioner submitted by Thomas G. Glass of Election Integrity Committee of the Libertarian Party of Texas of Hockley, Texas.
09/12/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
09/05/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review granted. No further extensions of time will be considered. Reply is due September 12, 2017.
09/05/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
09/01/2017Motion to Exceed Word Limit disposedDeniedMotion to Exceed Word Count Limit for Reply denied
08/31/2017Electronic communication received from Party Received email from respondent's counsel and he said that the respondent opposed the motion to exceed word limit but do not plan to file a response to it.
08/31/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Sent email to respondent's counsel to determine whether a written response to petitioner's motion to exceed word limit will be filed.
08/29/2017Motion to Exceed Word Limit Opposed Motion to Exceed Word Count Limit for Reply filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
08/14/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply is due September 7, 2017.
08/11/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
08/08/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gregorio (Greg) Casar.
06/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response is due August 9, 2017.
06/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gregorio Casar.
06/09/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than July 10, 2017.
05/09/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/03/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Gregorio Casar.
04/10/2017Letter Filed Letter regarding filing fee filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
04/07/2017Notice requesting filing fee Mailed fee request to petitioner for petition for review.
04/07/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
03/27/2017Motion to Exceed Word Limit disposedDeniedMotion to Exceed Word Limit in Petition for Review is denied.
03/24/2017Motion to Exceed Word Limit Motion to Exceed Word Limit in Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
02/28/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due April 7, 2017.
02/28/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
01/23/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. Petition for Review is due on March 8, 2017.
01/23/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laura Pressley.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/09/2017Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesUnder Review 
06/22/2018StatusPet/Rel reply brief on the merits dueFURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pressley, Laura PetitionerMs. Laura Pressley
Texas Association of CountiesAmicus CuriaeMr. Paul O'Neal Miles
Garry Anthony Merritt
Haddick, Carl Amicus CuriaeMr. Carl Haddick
Casar, Gregorio "Greg"RespondentMs. Lisa B. Hobbs
Mr. David Andrew Rogers
Ms. Lauren Ross
Mr. Kurt Kuhn  
Mr. Charles Herring Jr.
Attorney General Ken PaxtonAmicus CuriaeMr. Brantley D. Starr
Mr. Michael Toth
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Libertarian Party of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Thomas G. Glass
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
___ SW3d ___, 12-23-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable Melissa Young Goodwin 
Trial Court Information
201st District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Daniel H. Mills 
D-1-GN-15-000374-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site