Case: 16-1005    
16-1005
12/16/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
KENNETH H. TARR 
TIMBERWOOD PARK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/26/2018Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
02/14/2018Additional citations received.PetitionerSupplemental Authority filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
02/02/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
12/08/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerSupplemental Authorities filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
08/22/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerPetitioner’s Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
08/14/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
08/07/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
06/30/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
04/10/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
04/03/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
12/29/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/26/2018Case forwarded to Court  
06/26/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
06/15/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Motion for Rehearing is due on June 18, 2018.
06/15/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association.
05/25/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/25/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court. Justice Brown delivered the opinion of the Court.
(5/25/2018 4:24:35 PM) 161005.pdf, 16-1005.jmt.pdf
02/14/2018Additional citations received. Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
02/06/2018Submission Schedule  
02/06/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Patrick Sutton; Argued on behalf of respondent by Frank O. Carroll III and Mia B. Lorick
02/02/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
01/09/2018Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of respondent, Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Frank O. Carroll III and Mia B. Lorick of Roberts Markel Weinberg Butler Hailey PC of Houston, Texas.
12/08/2017Additional citations received. Supplemental Authorities filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
10/03/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Kenneth H. Tarr. Oral Argument will be presented by Patrick Sutton of the Law Office of J. Patrick Sutton of Austin, Texas.
09/22/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., February 6, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/22/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/22/2017Petition for Review granted  
08/22/2017Additional citations received. Petitioner’s Supplemental Authority filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
08/14/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
08/07/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
08/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSupplemental Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due August 7, 2017; and Reply brief is due August 22, 2107.
08/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSupplemental Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due August 7, 2017; and Reply brief is due August 22, 2107.
08/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Supplemental Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
07/31/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
07/21/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
06/30/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
06/09/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
06/09/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than July 10, 2017; Response brief due July 31, 2017; Reply brief due August 15, 2017.
06/02/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of Counsel J. Patrick Sutton filed on behalf of Kenneth Tarr.
05/30/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Left voicemail for Mr. J. Patrick Sutton regarding mailed vacation notice.
04/10/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
04/03/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
03/03/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than April 3, 2017.
01/31/2017Case forwarded to Court  
01/30/2017Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.
12/29/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr
12/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due January 27, 2017.
12/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kenneth H. Tarr.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/26/2018Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesMotion for Rehearing 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tarr, Kenneth H.PetitionerMr. J. Patrick Sutton  
Timberwood Park Owners Association, Inc.RespondentMs. Amy Magness Vanhoose
Mr. Frank O. Carroll III
Ms. Mia B. Lorick
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff As Mod 
510 SW3d 725, 11-16-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Karen A. Angelini 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3 
Bexar 
Honorable David J. Rodriguez 
2014CV02779 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site