Supreme Court

Case: 16-0990    
16-0990
12/07/2016
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
SSB HOLDINGS, INC., D/B/A PROTEC LABORATORY 
BLAIRE REID 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
05/31/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
04/14/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Blaire Reid.
01/30/2017Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc., d/b/a Protec Laboratory.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
10/16/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
09/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due on October 16, 2017. Respondent's Brief is due on November 6, 2017. Reply Brief is due on November 21, 2017.
09/26/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
09/05/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 6th COA
09/01/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than October 2, 2017; Response brief due October 23, 2017; Reply brief due November 7, 2017.
06/06/2017Case forwarded to Court  
05/31/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
04/25/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply is due on May 31, 2017.
04/25/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
04/18/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Spoke with Mr. Duke's assistant regarding resubmission of response to petition for review. She stated that it would be refiled today.
04/14/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Blaire Reid.
03/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Response is due April 14, 2017.
03/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Blaire Reid.
03/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Response is due March 31, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
03/01/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Blaire Reid.
01/30/2017Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc., d/b/a Protec Laboratory.
01/03/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petition for Review is due on January 30, 2017.
01/03/2017Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
12/08/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due January 9, 2017.
12/07/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of SSB Holdings, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/06/2017Work-Up by Staff / Review by JusticesUnder Review 
11/06/2017StatusRespondent/Real party in interest brief on the merit due 
11/21/2017StatusPet/Rel reply brief on the merits due 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reid, BlaireRespondentMr. Walker M. Duke
SSB Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Protec LaboratoryPetitionerMr. Barry A. Moscowitz
Mr. Michael A. Yanof
Ms. Cassie J. Dallas
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
506 SW3d 140, 10-25-16 
6th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Ralph K. Burgess 
Trial Court Information
402nd District Court 
Wood 
Honorable George Timothy Boswell 
2015-254 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site