Supreme Court

Case: 16-0935    
16-0935
11/17/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BILL YOUNGKIN 
BILLY G. HINES, JR. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/27/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerLetter regarding additional citation filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
05/30/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
05/03/2017Corrected BriefRespondentRespondent's Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
05/01/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
02/13/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
01/30/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
11/17/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Ty Clevenger; Argued on behalf of respondent by Angus E. "Andy" McSwain
12/01/2017Letter Filed Letter in response to the pre-submission letter brief filed November 27, 2017 by petitioner regarding Cantey Hanger, LLP v. Byrd, 467 S.W.3d 477 (Tex. 2015), filed on behalf of Billy Hines, Jr.
11/27/2017Additional citations received. Letter regarding additional citation filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
11/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Ty Clevenger filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
11/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Billy G. Hines, Jr. Oral Argument will be presented by Andy McSwain of Fulbright Winniford, P.C. of Waco, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 6, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/30/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
05/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply Brief is due May 30, 2017. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
05/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
05/03/2017Corrected Brief Respondent's Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
05/03/2017Call received Informed respondent attorney that a brief with a typo can be resubmitted as a correction.
05/01/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
03/15/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
03/13/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 10th COA
03/10/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than April 10, 2017; Response brief due May 1, 2017; Reply brief due May 16, 2017.
02/13/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
01/30/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
01/06/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 6, 2017.
11/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/21/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Billy G. Hines, Jr.
11/17/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bill Youngkin.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/06/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hines, Junior, Billy G.RespondentMr. Jay B. Goss
Ms. Lauren E. Jaynes
Mr. Andy E. McSwain  
Mr. Karl C. Hoppess
Youngkin, BillPetitionerMr. Ty O. Clevenger
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
524 SW3d 278, 07-13-16 
10th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rex D. Davis 
Trial Court Information
85th District Court 
Brazos 
Honorable Kyle Hawthorne 
13-002356-CV-85 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site