Supreme Court

Case: 16-0900    
16-0900
11/07/2016
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
BONNIE ALLEN-PIERONI 
MARC JOHN PIERONI 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen-Pieroni
05/22/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marc John Pieroni.
05/01/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen Pieroni.
03/10/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen-Pieroni.
02/13/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mark John Pieroni.
11/07/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen Pieroni.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/2018Case Stored e-stored
01/26/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
12/15/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
12/15/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to the trial court.  Per Curiam Opinion
(12/15/2017 2:01:05 PM) 160900.pdf, 16-0900.jmt.pdf
12/15/2017Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
12/15/2017Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
06/06/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen-Pieroni
05/22/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Marc John Pieroni.
05/01/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen Pieroni.
04/04/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
03/31/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
03/31/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than May 1, 2017; Response brief due May 22, 2017; Reply brief due June 6, 2017.
03/10/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen-Pieroni.
03/02/2017MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply in Support of Petition for Review is due on March 10, 2017.
02/28/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Emailed counsel for respondent to determine if a response will be filed.
02/28/2017Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen Pieroni.
02/13/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Mark John Pieroni.
01/13/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 13, 2017.
12/13/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/07/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Bonnie Allen Pieroni.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/14/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allen-Pieroni, BonniePetitionerMr. Emil Lippe Jr.
Pieroni, Mark JohnRespondentMr. Jared C. Inman
Mr. Jeffrey M. Travis
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Ren/Pt 
538 SW3d 631, 07-26-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable David L. Bridges 
Trial Court Information
199th District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Angela Michelle Tucker 
199-02065-2014 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site