Supreme Court

Case: 16-0854    
16-0854
10/21/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
HIAWATHA HENRY, ADDIE HARRIS, MONTRAY NORRIS, AND ROOSEVELT COLEMAN, JR., ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND FOR ALL OTHER SIMILARLY SITUATED 
CASH BIZ, LP, CASH ZONE, LLC D/B/A CASH BIZ AND REDWOOD FINANCIALS, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/25/2017Additional citations received.RespondentResponse to Additional Citations filed on behalf of Cash Biz LP.
05/19/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerNew Opinion from the United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
05/19/2017Additional citations received.PetitionerPetitioners' Supplemental Letter Brief providing additional citations filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
05/05/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
04/20/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cash Biz LP.
03/20/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
03/20/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Appleseed in Support of Petitioners. Submitted by Ricardo G. Cedillo of Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
12/30/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP, et al.
10/21/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Appleseed in support of Petition. Submitted by Ricardo G. Cedillo of  Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
10/21/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/29/2017Petition for Review disposedAbated due to bankruptcy 
09/29/2017Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedEffective September 18, 2017, the cause is abated pursuant to TEX. R. APP. P.  8.2 until further order of this Court and is removed from the Court's active docket, subject to reinstatement upon proper motion.  TEX. R. APP. P. 8.3.  All motions and other documents pending or filed are abated subject to being reurged in the event the case is reinstated.  TEX. R. APP. P. 8.2, 8.3.  It is the parties' responsibility to immediately notify this Court once the automatic bankruptcy stay is lifted.
09/27/2017Notice of Bankruptcy Notice of Bankruptcy filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP.
09/15/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Daniel R. Dutko; Argued on behalf of respondents by Edward S. Hubbard
09/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Edward S. Hubbard with Coats Rose, PC of Houston, Texas, filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP, et al.
09/05/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners, Hiawatha Henry, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Daniel R. Dutko of Hanszen Laporte, LLP of Houston, Texas.
09/01/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to parties informing them that oral argument set for September 15, 2017 will still be held at the University of Houston Law Center.  Left messages.
08/16/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of Change of Address for Daniel R. Dutko, attorney for Petitioners Hiawatha Henry, et al.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argument Oral argument of this cause will be conducted on Friday, September 15, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at the University of Houston Law Center in Houston, Texas.  See TEX. CONST. ART. V., § 3(a).
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/25/2017Additional citations received. Response to Additional Citations filed on behalf of Cash Biz LP.
05/19/2017Additional citations received. New Opinion from the United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
05/19/2017Additional citations received. Petitioners' Supplemental Letter Brief providing additional citations filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
05/05/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
04/20/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cash Biz LP.
04/04/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on April 20, 2107. Reply Brief is due on May 5, 2017.
04/04/2017Motion for Extension of Time filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP, et al.
03/20/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
03/20/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Appleseed in Support of Petitioners. Submitted by Ricardo G. Cedillo of Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
02/27/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
12/30/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP, et al.
12/02/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 2, 2017.
11/01/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/25/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Cash Biz, LP, et al.
10/21/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Appleseed in support of Petition. Submitted by Ricardo G. Cedillo of  Davis, Cedillo & Mendoza, Inc. of San Antonio, Texas.
10/21/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Hiawatha Henry, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/29/2017Case Abated CASE IS ABATED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cash Biz, L.P.RespondentMr. Edward S. Hubbard
Mr. Patrick E. Gaas
All Similarly Situated PlaintiffsPetitionerMr. H. Mark Burck
Mr. Daniel R. Dutko
Norris, MontrayPetitionerMr. H. Mark Burck
Mr. Daniel R. Dutko
Henry, HiawathaPetitionerMr. H. Mark Burck
Mr. Daniel R. Dutko
Harris, AddiePetitionerMr. Daniel R. Dutko
Mr. H. Mark Burck
Texas AppleseedAmicus CuriaeMr. Ricardo G. Cedillo
Coleman, Jr., RooseveltPetitionerMr. H. Mark Burck
Mr. Daniel R. Dutko
Cash Zone, LLC d/b/a Cash BizRespondentMr. Patrick E. Gaas
Mr. Edward S. Hubbard
Redwood Financials, LLCRespondentMr. Patrick E. Gaas
Mr. Edward S. Hubbard
Mr. Sumit Kumar Arora  
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev & Ren/Pt and Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 07-27-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Jason Kenneth Pulliam 
Trial Court Information
224th District Court 
Bexar 
Honorable Laura Salinas 
2015-CI-01545 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site