Supreme Court

Case: 16-0851    
16-0851
10/20/2016
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE NORTH CYPRESS MEDICAL CENTER OPERATING CO., LTD. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/08/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The Fuentes Firm P.C. Submitted by Robert Fuentes of Spring, Texas.
11/03/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedReal Parties in Interest Real Party in Interest's Brief in Response to Amici Briefs filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
11/02/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of The Alliance of Claims Assistance Professionals. Submitted by Charles W. Bailey, Jr. of Law Offices of Charles W. Bailey of Austin, Texas and George A. Nation III of Lehigh University of Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
05/26/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter of Memorial Hermann Health Systems. Submitted by Geoffrey Gannaway of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
05/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of CHRISTUS Health and Texas Health Resources. Submitted by R. Brent Cooper and Diana L. Faust of Cooper & Scully, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
04/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Dallas County Hospital District and Hunt Memorial Hospital District. Submitted by Douglas D. Turek of the Turek Law Firm, P.C. of The Woodlands, Texas.
04/24/2017Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
03/20/2017Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
12/07/2016Reply to ResponseRelatorReply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
12/06/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
10/20/2016Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/09/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of relator by Shelli Morrison; Argued on behalf of real party in interest by R. James Amaro; Argued on behalf of amici curiae by R. Brent Cooper
11/08/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to parties regarding updated order of oral argument for November 9, 2017.
11/08/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The Fuentes Firm P.C. Submitted by Robert Fuentes of Spring, Texas.
11/03/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Real Party in Interest's Brief in Response to Amici Briefs filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
11/03/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of amici curiae, CHRISTUS Health and Texas Health Resources. Oral Argument will be presented by R. Brent Cooper of Cooper & Scully, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
11/02/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion of Resident Attorney Charles W. Bailey Jr. in support of George Nation III's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
11/02/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of non-resident attorney George Nation, III is granted.
11/02/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Resident Attorney's Motion in Support of George Nation's Motion Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of The Alliance of Claims Assistance Professionals.
11/02/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of non-resident attorney George Nation, III filed on behalf of amicus curiae, The Alliance of Claims Assistance Professionals.
11/02/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of The Alliance of Claims Assistance Professionals. Submitted by Charles W. Bailey, Jr. of Law Offices of Charles W. Bailey of Austin, Texas and George A. Nation III of Lehigh University of Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
10/31/2017Letter Filed Relator's Letter regarding "how they wish to share up to 10 minutes of its oral argument time with the Amici Curiae" filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
10/20/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion to Participate in Oral Argument granted.  The Relator should inform the Court on how they wish to share up to 10 minutes of its oral argument time with the Amici Curiae no later than October 31, 2017
10/11/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of real party in interest, Crystal Ann Roberts. Oral Argument will be presented by R. James Amaro of the Amaro Law Firm of Houston, Texas.
10/11/2017Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed Motion of Christus Health and Texas Health Resources to Participate in Oral Argument as Amici Curiae.
10/11/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Shelli Morrison with The Morrison Law Firm of Athens, Texas, filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 9, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Mandamus Set to Argue  
06/23/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argumentThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/26/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter of Memorial Hermann Health Systems. Submitted by Geoffrey Gannaway of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
05/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of CHRISTUS Health and Texas Health Resources. Submitted by R. Brent Cooper and Diana L. Faust of Cooper & Scully, P.C. of Dallas, Texas.
04/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Dallas County Hospital District and Hunt Memorial Hospital District. Submitted by Douglas D. Turek of the Turek Law Firm, P.C. of The Woodlands, Texas.
04/24/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
03/20/2017Brief on the Merits Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested: Relator's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
12/13/2016Case forwarded to Court  
12/07/2016Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record Supplement to Mandamus Record filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
12/07/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
12/06/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Crystal Ann Roberts.
11/29/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than December 9, 2016.
11/29/2016Motion to Stay DisposedDeniedRelator's Emergency Motion to Stay denied
11/17/2016Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
11/01/2016Letter Filed Letter informing the Court that the trial court judge has orally advised the parties that he is granting a continuance of the production deadline until December 1, 2016, filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating, Co., Ltd
11/01/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message for Ms. Morrison. Requested status of emergency motion filed in the trial court.
10/25/2016Motion to Stay Filed  Motion to Stay filed on behalf of N. Cypress Medical Center Operating Co.
10/20/2016Case Record Filed  Mandamus Record filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
10/20/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted relator's counsel, Mr. Chad Ruback, to inquire about the trial court's final order. Per Mr. Ruback, he never received the order signed by the judge.
10/20/2016Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/09/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Memorial Hermann Health SystemAmicus CuriaeMr. Geoffrey A. Gannaway  
The Alliance of Claims Assistance ProfessionalsAmicus CuriaeMr. George Nation III
Charles Bailey Jr.
North Cypress Medical Center Operating Co., Ltd.RelatorMs. Shelli M.J. Morrison
Mr. Chad M. Ruback
Mr. Byron L. Kelley
Dallas County Hospital District d/b/a Amici Health and Hospital System and Hunt Memorial Hospital District d/b/a Hunt Regional Medical CenterAmicus CuriaeErin Ruth Hartung
Mr. Douglas D. Turek
Amy Kogan
Roberts, Crystal AnnReal Party in Interest Mr. R. James Amaro Jr.
The Fuentes Firm, P.C.Amicus CuriaeMr. Juan Roberto Fuentes  
CHRISTUS Health and Texas Health ResourcesAmicus CuriaeMs. Diana L. Faust
Mr. R. Brent Cooper
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 10-20-16 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Per Curiam 
Trial Court Information
234th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Wesley R. Ward 
2016-17517 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site