Supreme Court

Case: 16-0836    
16-0836
10/17/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON, BELLA PATEL, M.D., F.C.C.P., RICHARD W. SMALLING, M.D. PHD., RACHSHUNDA MAJID, M.D. AND FRANCISCO FUENTES, M.D. 
TOMAS G. RIOS, M.D. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/25/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
05/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tomas G. Rios, M.D.
04/20/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
02/21/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of  The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
02/06/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tomas G. Rios.
10/17/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/12/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Beth Klusmann; Argued on behalf of respondent by Jeremy Saenz
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Jeremy Saenz with Wagner & Saenz, LLP of Houston, Texas, filed on behalf of Tomas G. Rios, M.D.
09/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Beth Klusmann of the Attorney General.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., October 12, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
05/25/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
05/10/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tomas G. Rios, M.D.
04/20/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
04/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotionfor Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due on April 20, 2017. Response Brief is due on May 10, 2017. Reply Brief is due on May 25, 2017.
04/03/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
03/15/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
03/13/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
03/10/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than April 10, 2017; Response brief due May 1, 2017; Reply brief due May 16, 2017.
02/21/2017Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of  The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
02/06/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Tomas G. Rios.
01/06/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 6, 2017.
11/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/17/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/12/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Patel, BellaPetitionerAtty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Douglas D. Geyser  
Ms. Beth E. Klusmann
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Frank A. King
Rios, Tomas G.RespondentMr. Jeremy D. Saenz
Fuentes, FranciscoPetitionerMr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Douglas D. Geyser  
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Frank A. King
Ms. Beth E. Klusmann
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Smalling, Richard W.PetitionerMs. Beth E. Klusmann
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Frank A. King
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Douglas D. Geyser  
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
The University of Texas Health Science Center at HoustonPetitionerMr. Scott A. Keller
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Frank A. King
Ms. Beth E. Klusmann
Mr. Douglas D. Geyser  
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Majid, RuckshandaPetitionerMs. Beth E. Klusmann
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Douglas D. Geyser  
Mr. Frank A. King
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
507 SW3d 312, 09-01-16 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Laura C. Higley 
Trial Court Information
165th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Debra Ibarra Mayfield 
2015-23764 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site