Supreme Court

Case: 16-0804    
16-0804
10/07/2016
Third Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
GARY DON PERRYMAN, NANCY K. PERRYMAN AND LEASHA PERRYMAN BOWDEN 
SPARTAN TEXAS SIX CAPITAL PARTNERS, LTD., SPARTAN TEXAS SIX-CELINA, LTD. AND DION MENSER; AND EOG RESOURCES INC. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/2017Supplemental Letter BriefPetitionerReply Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc. and the Perrymans.
11/17/2017Supplemental Letter BriefRespondentSupplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Ltd., et al.
05/24/2017Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
05/24/2017Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
05/24/2017Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
05/09/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
05/09/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
05/09/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
04/19/2017Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd.
04/19/2017Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
03/20/2017Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
01/23/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
01/23/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
01/13/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd.
01/10/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Petition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources Inc.
01/09/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to EOG Resources' Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
01/09/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Gary Don Perryman, et al.'s Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
12/27/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to EOG Resources, Inc.'s Petition for Review filed on behalf fo Gary Don Perryman, et al.
12/27/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
10/24/2016Petition for Review #3PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
10/12/2016Petition for Review #2PetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
10/07/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent, Perrymans, et al., by D. D'Lyn Davison; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, Spartan, et al., by Henry Kollenberg; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, EOG Resources, Inc., by Lawrence F. Labanowski
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent, Perrymans, et al., by D. D'Lyn Davison; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, Spartan, et al., by Henry Kollenberg; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, EOG Resources, Inc., by Lawrence F. Labanowski
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner/cross-respondent, Perrymans, et al., by D. D'Lyn Davison; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, Spartan, et al., by Henry Kollenberg; Argued on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner, EOG Resources, Inc., by Lawrence F. Labanowski
12/01/2017Letter Filed Letter stating order of oral argument filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
12/01/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received STRUCK Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, EOG Resources Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Lawrence F. Labanowski of Labanowski & Associates of Houston Texas.
12/01/2017Supplemental Letter Brief Reply Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc. and the Perrymans.
12/01/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Calls made to party attorneys regarding how they wish to split time.  Each party marked themself as both petitioner and respondent.
11/17/2017Supplemental Letter Brief Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Ltd., et al.
11/10/2017Call received From Mr. Larry Labanoskwi in re:  splitting oral argument times.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioners/cross-respondents, Gary Don Perryman, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by D. D'Lyn Davison of Davison Rugeley, L.L.P. of Wichita Falls, Texas.
11/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent/cross-petitioner EOG Resources, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by James W. McCartney of Houston, Texas.
11/07/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondents/cross-petitioners Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Henry Kollenberg of Crain, Caton & James, P.C. of Houston, Texas.
11/02/2017Call received Spoke with counsel Dave Polsinelli regarding the structure of the oral argument.
11/01/2017Call received Spoke with counsel Larry Labanowski regarding the structure of the oral argument when there are multiple petitions filed.
11/01/2017Call received Call received from Mr. McCartney regarding Oral Argument Submission Forms.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
06/23/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
06/05/2017Call received Call received from Mr. McCartney regarding letter received by mail.
06/02/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. James McCartney regarding letter received by mail.
05/24/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
05/24/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
05/24/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
05/09/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
05/09/2017Brief on the Merits Respondents' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
05/09/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
04/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
04/19/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Designation of Counsel filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
04/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd.
03/20/2017Brief on the Merits Opening Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
03/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due April 19, 2017; Respondent's brief is due May 9, 2017; and Reply brief is due May 24, 2017.
03/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unoppsed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitoner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
02/22/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 14th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
01/23/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
01/23/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
01/13/2017Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd.
01/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. Response was filed on January 10, 2017.
01/10/2017Response to Petition Response to Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Petition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources Inc.
01/10/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of EOG Resources Inc.
01/09/2017Response to Petition Response to EOG Resources' Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
01/09/2017Response to Petition Response to Gary Don Perryman, et al.'s Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
12/27/2016Response to Petition Response to EOG Resources, Inc.'s Petition for Review filed on behalf fo Gary Don Perryman, et al.
12/27/2016Response to Petition Response to Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
12/12/2016Call received Mr. Kollenberg informed the court of his correct email address: hkollenberg@craincraton.com.
12/09/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested responses to petitions for review due no later than January 9, 2017.
11/08/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/08/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/08/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/07/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver for Petitions for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
10/31/2016Response Waiver filed Response waiver filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners.
10/24/2016Petition for Review #3 Petition for Review filed on behalf of Spartan Texas Six Capital Partners, Ltd., et al.
10/12/2016Petition for Review #2 Petition for Review filed on behalf of EOG Resources, Inc.
10/10/2016Notice received Notice of Email Addresses filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman.
10/07/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Gary Don Perryman, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/01/2017StatusDocument struckPET OA SUBM FORM STRUCK: scanned.
12/05/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bowden, Leasha PerrymanPetitionerMs. D. D'Lyn Davison
Ms. Cora L. Moore
Menser, DionRespondentMr. C. Henry Kollenberg Jr.
Mr. H. Miles Cohn
Mr. David A. Polsinelli
Spartan Texas Six Capital PartnersRespondentMr. H. Miles Cohn
Mr. David A. Polsinelli
Mr. C. Henry Kollenberg Jr.
Spartan Texas Six-Celina, Ltd.RespondentMr. H. Miles Cohn
Mr. David A. Polsinelli
Mr. C. Henry Kollenberg Jr.
Perryman, Gary DonPetitionerMs. Cora L. Moore
Ms. D. D'Lyn Davison
EOG Resources, Inc.Petitioner 2Mr. Edward F. Mulholland
Mr. Lawrence F. Labanowski
Mr. James W. McCartney
Mr. Doug J. Dashiell
Perryman, Nancy K.PetitionerMs. Cora L. Moore
Ms. D. D'Lyn Davison
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff As Mod 
494 SW3d 735, 03-01-16 
14th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Sharon Sue Mccally 
Trial Court Information
11th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Michael David Miller 
2011-27476 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site