Supreme Court

Case: 16-0748    
16-0748
09/22/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
CITY OF LAREDO, TEXAS 
LAREDO MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief on BCCA Appeal Group, Inc. Submitted by Evan Young of Baker Botts L.L.P. of Austin, Texas.
03/06/2018Post submission brief filedRespondentResponse to City's Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
03/02/2018Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/30/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief submitted by Mr. and Mrs. Gerry Willis.
01/10/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/10/2018Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentBench Exhibits filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
01/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae Rio Grande International Study Center In Support of the City of Laredo. Submitted by Marisa Perales of Frederick Perales Allmon & Rockwell PC of Austin, Texas.
01/04/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from Black Bass Unlimited, et al.  Submitted by Mary Whittle with Guerrero & Whittle PC of Austin, Texas.
01/02/2018Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texans for Clean Water, Inc. submitted by Joel Rheman of Sullins, Johnston, Rohrbach & Magers of Houston, Texas.
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Honorable Jose Aliseda. Submitted by Jennifer D. Jasper of Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Campaign for the Environment in support of the City of Lardo, Texas. Submitted by Blair Dancy of Cain & Skarnulis PLLC of Austin, Texas.
12/21/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief received from Environment Texas, et al.  Submitted by Charles Irvine with Irvine & Conner PLLC of Houston, Texas.
12/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of The City of Laredo received on behalf of Turtle Island Restoration Network.  Submitted by Kelly Haragan with Environmental Clinic University of Texas School of Law of Austin, Texas.
08/23/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Cotton Ginners’ Association Billy Joe Easter in Support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Bruce Bodson of Bodson Environmental Law and Science, P.C. of Missouri Texas.
08/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The City of Galveston submitted by Donald S. Glywasky of Galveston, Texas.
07/07/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
07/07/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of The City of Houston submitted by Collyn A. Peddie of City of Houston Legal Department of Houston, Texas.
06/22/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Retailers Association submitted by Edward D. Burbach of Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP of Austin, Texas.
06/22/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter submitted by Frances Hagga.
06/15/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Second Amicus Curiae Brief of The State of Texas. Submitted by Austin R. Nimocks of Austin, Texas.
06/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Second Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke of Austin, Texas.
05/24/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
04/05/2017Corrected BriefPetitionerCorrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
04/04/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/17/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas State Senator Judith Zaffirini in Support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Timothy Stostad of Texas State Capitol, Austin, Texas.
12/30/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Municipal League and Texas City Attorneys Association in support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Christy Drake-Adams of Athe Texas Municipal League of Austin, Texas.
12/22/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
12/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The State of Texas in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Austin R. Nimocks, Associate Deputy Attorney General of the Office of Special Litigation, Austin Texas.
12/08/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke of Austin, Texas.
12/07/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
11/07/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of City of Laredo.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/30/2018Case Stored e-stored
08/09/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/22/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
06/22/2018Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Guzman delivered a concurring opinion, in which Justice Lehrmann joined.
06/22/2018Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court. (Justice Blacklock not sitting)
(6/22/2018 11:29:03 AM) 160748c.pdf, 160748.pdf, 16-0748.jmt.pdf
03/20/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief on BCCA Appeal Group, Inc. Submitted by Evan Young of Baker Botts L.L.P. of Austin, Texas.
03/06/2018Post submission brief filed Response to City's Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
03/02/2018Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/30/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief submitted by Mr. and Mrs. Gerry Willis.
01/11/2018Submission Schedule  
01/11/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Dale Wainwright; Argued on behalf of respondent by Richard B. Phillips, Jr.; Argued on behalf of amicus curiae, The State of Texas, by Scott A. Keller (Justice Blacklock not sitting)
01/11/2018Letter Filed Letter filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/10/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
01/10/2018Exhibits in case/cause filed Bench Exhibits filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
01/09/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae Rio Grande International Study Center In Support of the City of Laredo. Submitted by Marisa Perales of Frederick Perales Allmon & Rockwell PC of Austin, Texas.
01/04/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from Black Bass Unlimited, et al.  Submitted by Mary Whittle with Guerrero & Whittle PC of Austin, Texas.
01/02/2018Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texans for Clean Water, Inc. submitted by Joel Rheman of Sullins, Johnston, Rohrbach & Magers of Houston, Texas.
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of the Honorable Jose Aliseda. Submitted by Jennifer D. Jasper of Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Campaign for the Environment in support of the City of Lardo, Texas. Submitted by Blair Dancy of Cain & Skarnulis PLLC of Austin, Texas.
12/21/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief received from Environment Texas, et al.  Submitted by Charles Irvine with Irvine & Conner PLLC of Houston, Texas.
12/13/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association. Oral Argument will be presented by Richard B. Phillips, Jr. of Thompson & Knight LLP of Dallas, Texas.
12/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of The City of Laredo received on behalf of Turtle Island Restoration Network.  Submitted by Kelly Haragan with Environmental Clinic University of Texas School of Law of Austin, Texas.
12/01/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of amicus curiae State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by Scott A. Keller of the Office of the Attorney General, Austin Texas.
12/01/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, City of Laredo. Oral Argument will be presented by Dale Wainwright of Greenberg Traurig, LLP of Austin, Texas.
12/01/2017Motion to Argue disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion of Amicus Curiae the State of Texas to Participate in Oral Argument granted.  Time allotted to argue:  20/15/5 minutes
11/28/2017Motion to Argue filed Unopposed Motion of Amicus Curiae the State of Texas to Participate in Oral Argument filed.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 11, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
08/23/2017Letter Filed Amicus Rio Grande International Study Center, which has an interest in this appeal, will be submitting to the Court an amicus curiae brief. Submitted by Marisa Perales of Frederick Perales Allmon & Rockwell PC of Austin, Texas.
08/23/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Cotton Ginners’ Association Billy Joe Easter in Support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Bruce Bodson of Bodson Environmental Law and Science, P.C. of Missouri Texas.
08/18/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The City of Galveston submitted by Donald S. Glywasky of Galveston, Texas.
07/07/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
07/07/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of The City of Houston submitted by Collyn A. Peddie of City of Houston Legal Department of Houston, Texas.
06/22/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Retailers Association submitted by Edward D. Burbach of Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP of Austin, Texas.
06/22/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter submitted by Frances Hagga.
06/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Reply Brief is due July 7, 2017.
06/20/2017Electronic communication received from Party Respondent does not oppose the second motion for extension of time.
06/20/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to Mr. James Harris inquiring whether respondent opposes the second motion for extension of time.
06/20/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
06/15/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Second Amicus Curiae Brief of The State of Texas. Submitted by Austin R. Nimocks of Austin, Texas.
06/09/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Second Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke of Austin, Texas.
06/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Reply brief is due June 23, 2017.
06/02/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
05/25/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedResident Attorney, Richard B. Phillips, Jr.'s Motion in support of James K. Lehman’s Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
05/25/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedNon-Resident Attorney, James K. Lehman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
05/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of non-resident attorney James K. Lehman filed on behalf of Respondent, the Laredo Merchants Association.
05/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of non-resident attorney James K. Lehman filed on behalf of Respondent, the Laredo Merchants Association.
05/24/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
04/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due May 24, 2017; and Reply brief is due June 8, 2017.
04/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
04/05/2017Letter Filed Letter to the Court in reference to the Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
04/05/2017Corrected Brief Corrected Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
04/04/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
03/29/2017Letter Filed Letter filed regarding change of counsel for City of Laredo, Texas.
03/17/2017Notice from Counsel of a change in address Change of Address Notice for Dale Wainwright, counsel for City of Laredo, Texas.
03/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due April 4, 2017; Respondent's brief is due April 24, 2017; and Reply brief is due May 9, 2017.
03/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
03/03/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 4th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
01/17/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas State Senator Judith Zaffirini in Support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Timothy Stostad of Texas State Capitol, Austin, Texas.
12/30/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Municipal League and Texas City Attorneys Association in support of the City of Laredo, Texas. Submitted by Christy Drake-Adams of Athe Texas Municipal League of Austin, Texas.
12/30/2016Electronic communication received from Party Email exchange from Timothy Stostad regarding submission of Amicus Curiae Briefs.
12/23/2016Amended Reply Filed Amended Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
12/22/2016Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Laredo, Texas.
12/14/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The State of Texas in support of Petition for Review. Submitted by Austin R. Nimocks, Associate Deputy Attorney General of the Office of Special Litigation, Austin Texas.
12/13/2016Case forwarded to Court  
12/08/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Public Policy Foundation. Submitted by Robert Henneke of Austin, Texas.
12/07/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Laredo Merchants Association.
11/07/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Laredo.
09/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Petition for Review is due November 7, 2016.
09/22/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of the City of Laredo.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/30/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Willis, Gerry Amicus CuriaeMr. Gerry Willis
Environment TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles W. Irvine
Black Bass UnlimitedAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Parten, EdwardAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
The City of HoustonAmicus CuriaeMr. Ronald C. Lewis
Ms. Judith L. Ramsey
Ms. Collyn A. Peddie
Farah, JoeyAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Texas State Senators and Texas State RepresentativesAmicus CuriaeMs. Kristina M. Williams
Mr. Christopher D. Kratovil
Texas Public Policy FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Robert Earl Henneke
Texas Cotton Ginners’ Association Billy Joe EasterAmicus CuriaeMr. Bruce R. Bodson
Texas Campaign for the EnvironmentAmicus CuriaeMr. Zachary H. Bowman  
Mr. Christopher Blair Dancy
Ms. Taylor R. Romero
Texas Municipal League and Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus CuriaeMs. Christy Drake-Adams
Webb, RobertAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Natural GrocersAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles W. Irvine
Cantrell, ShaneAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Willis, Mrs. Gerry Amicus Curiae 
Texas Retailers AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Edward D. Burbach
Bicycle Sport ShopAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles W. Irvine
City of Laredo, TexasPetitionerMr. Brian Hogue
Ms. Andrea Broyles
Mr. Raul Casso IV
Mr. Alan W. Hersh
Ms. Kristina K. Laurel
Ms. Lindsay E. Hagans
Mr. Dale Wainwright  
BCCA Appeal Group, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Matthew L. Kuryla  
Mr. Evan A. Young
Ms. Ellen E. Springer
Texas State Senator Judith ZaffiriniAmicus CuriaeMr. Timothy Stostad
Texans for Clean Water, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Joel Rheman
Aliseda, JoseAmicus CuriaeMs. Jennifer D. Jasper
Rio Grande International Study CenterAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard W. Lowerre
Ms. Marisa Perales
Hagga, Frances Amicus CuriaeMr. Frances Hagga
The State of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Brantley D. Starr
Atty. Gen. W. Kenneth Paxton Jr.
Mr. Michael Toth
Mr. Scott Keller
Mr. David Austin Robert Nimocks
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
The City of GalvestonAmicus CuriaeMr. Donald S. Glywasky
Mr. Kimberly K. Coogan
Van Zandt, J. T.Amicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Hickman, ScottAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary Whittle
Laredo Merchants AssociationRespondentMr. Richard B. Phillips Jr.
Mr. Gabriel C. Gonzalez
Mr. Christopher C. Peterson
Mr. James K. Lehman
Mr. James B. Harris
Turtle Island Restoration NetworkAmicus CuriaeKelly Haragan
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
___ SW3d ___, 08-17-16 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Marialyn Price Barnard 
Trial Court Information
341st District Court 
Webb 
Honorable Rebecca Beckie Palomo Ramirez 
2015-CVQ-00-1077-D3 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site