Supreme Court

Case: 16-0718    
16-0718
09/12/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
CITY OF MAGNOLIA 4A ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION AND CITY OF MAGNOLIA 4B COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 
DAVID SMEDLEY 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/25/2017Reply BriefPetitionerPetitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corp., et al.
04/10/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of David Smedley.
03/19/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corp., et al.
12/28/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Davis Smedley.
12/19/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General and Bill Davis, Assistant Solicitor General, of the Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
10/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Municipal League and Texas City Attorneys Association in support of Petition for Review. Filed by Roger W. Hughes of Adams & Graham, L.L.P. of Harlingen, Texas.
09/12/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corporation, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/2017Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
10/27/2017Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
10/27/2017Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsPursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court reverses in part the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. Per Curiam Opinion
(10/27/2017 3:47:02 PM) 160718.pdf, 16-0718.jmt.pdf
10/27/2017Petition for Review disposedPetition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 
10/27/2017Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1  
04/25/2017Reply Brief Petitioner's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corp., et al.
04/10/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of David Smedley.
03/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corp., et al.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 9th COA
02/21/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
12/28/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Davis Smedley.
12/19/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The State of Texas. Submitted by Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General and Bill Davis, Assistant Solicitor General, of the Office of the Attorney General of Austin, Texas.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due December 28, 2016.
11/18/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of David Smedley.
10/28/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than November 28, 2016.
10/17/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Municipal League and Texas City Attorneys Association in support of Petition for Review. Filed by Roger W. Hughes of Adams & Graham, L.L.P. of Harlingen, Texas.
09/27/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/26/2016Phone call from Clerk's Office Called attorney for respondent to follow up on struck response waiver.
09/23/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of David Smedley.
09/12/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corporation, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/2017Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Smedley, DavidRespondentMr. Jonathan Parchman
Mr. K. C. Ghanean
Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Roger W. Hughes
City of Magnolia 4B Community Development CorporationPetitionerMr. Ramon G. Viada III
The State of TexasAmicus CuriaeMr. Bill Davis
Mr. Scott A. Keller
City of Magnolia 4A Economic Development Corporation PetitionerMr. Ramon G. Viada III
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
___ SW3d ___, 07-28-16 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Leanne Johnson 
Trial Court Information
410th District Court 
Montgomery 
Honorable K. Michael Mayes 
14-11-12312-CV  
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site