Supreme Court

Case: 16-0682    
16-0682
09/02/2016
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE ANDREW SILVER 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of American Intellectual Property Law Association. Submitted by Peter E. Mims of Vinson & Elkins LLP of Houston; and authored by Mark L. Whitaker, President of AIPLA.
03/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Lawrence J. Fox.
03/01/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of Intellectual Property Owners Association (IPO). Submitted by Sparkle T. Ellison of Boulware & Valoir of Houston, Texas.
02/28/2017Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc. Submitted by Louis J. Hoffman of Hoffman Patent Firm of Scottsdale, AZ; Shawn D. Blackburn of Susman Godfrey LLP of Houston, TX; and Ian B. Crosby of Susman Godfrey LLP of Seattle, WA.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter of U.S. Section of Fédération Internationale Des Conseils En Propriété Intellectuelle (FICPI). Submitted by Christopher T. Blackford with Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP of Washington, DC.
02/21/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Austin Intellectual Property Law Association submitted by Stephen Dartt of DECHERT LLP of Austin, TX.
02/20/2017Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Letter received and submitted on behalf of David Hricik.
02/08/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief received from Houston Intellectual Property Law Association. Submitted by Daniel J. Krueger with Iselin Law PLLC of Cypress, Texas.
02/06/2017Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tabletop Media, LLC.
01/17/2017Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
10/24/2016Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorReply in support of petition for writ of mandamus filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
10/14/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition filed on behalf of Tabletop Media, LLC
09/02/2016Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/09/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of relator by Jane Langdell Robinson; Argued on behalf of real party in interest by Brett C. Govett (Justice Guzman not sitting)
11/08/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Email sent to parties regarding order of oral argument set for November 9, 2017.
10/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Real Party in Interest Tabletop Media, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Brett C. Govett of Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP. of Dallas, Texas.
10/03/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of relator, Andrew Silver. Oral Argument will be presented by Jane Langdell Robinson of Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing P.C. of Houston, Texas.
08/10/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of American Intellectual Property Law Association. Submitted by Peter E. Mims of Vinson & Elkins LLP of Houston; and authored by Mark L. Whitaker, President of AIPLA.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 9, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes  (Justice Guzman not sitting)
06/16/2017Mandamus Set to Argue  
06/16/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argumentThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/13/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Lawrence J. Fox.
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Fox's Motion Pro Hac Vice granted
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to appear as Amicus Curie granted
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Fox's Motion Pro Hac Vice submitted by resident attorney Mr. Robert Blackwell.
03/13/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to appear as Amicus Curie filed on behalf of non resident attorney, Lawrence J. Fox.
03/01/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of Intellectual Property Owners Association (IPO). Submitted by Sparkle T. Ellison of Boulware & Valoir of Houston, Texas.
02/28/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
02/28/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc. Submitted by Louis J. Hoffman of Hoffman Patent Firm of Scottsdale, AZ; Shawn D. Blackburn of Susman Godfrey LLP of Houston, TX; and Ian B. Crosby of Susman Godfrey LLP of Seattle, WA.
02/27/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter of U.S. Section of Fédération Internationale Des Conseils En Propriété Intellectuelle (FICPI). Submitted by Christopher T. Blackford with Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLP of Washington, DC.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedShawn Blackburn's Motion in Support of Louis J. Hoffman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedLouis J. Hoffman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedShawn Blackburn's Motion in Support of Ian. B. Crosby's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/27/2017Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedIan B. Crosby's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted.
02/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Shawn Blackburn's Motion in Support of Louis J. Hoffman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.
02/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Shawn Blackburn's Motion in Support of Ian. B. Crosby's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.
02/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Louis J. Hoffman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of amicus curiae National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc.
02/24/2017Pro hac vice motion filed Ian B. Crosby's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of amicus curiae National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc.
02/21/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Austin Intellectual Property Law Association submitted by Stephen Dartt of DECHERT LLP of Austin, TX.
02/20/2017Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Letter received and submitted on behalf of David Hricik.
02/14/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due on February 28, 2017.
02/13/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
02/08/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief received from Houston Intellectual Property Law Association. Submitted by Daniel J. Krueger with Iselin Law PLLC of Cypress, Texas.
02/06/2017Brief on the Merits Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Tabletop Media, LLC.
02/03/2017Call received Mr. Lee Eubanks informed the court that an amicus brief on behalf of Houston IP Law Association will be filed next week.
01/17/2017Brief on the Merits Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
12/16/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Relator's brief due no later than January 17, 2017; Response brief due February 6, 2017; Reply brief due February 21, 2017.
10/24/2016Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Reply in support of petition for writ of mandamus filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
10/18/2016Call received Call received from Counsel for Relator, a Reply to the Response will be filed in this case.
10/18/2016Case forwarded to Court  
10/14/2016Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record Supplement to Record filed on behalf of Tabletop Media LLC.
10/14/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition filed on behalf of Tabletop Media, LLC
09/16/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Response is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Requested Response is due October 14, 2016.
09/14/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response filed on behalf of Real-Party-in-Interest Tabletop Media, LLC.
09/13/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than September 23, 2016.
09/13/2016Stay Order issued  
09/13/2016Motion to Stay DisposedFiling grantedRelator's Unopposed Motion for Temporary Stay of Order Compelling Production granted
09/02/2016Case Record Filed  Record filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
09/02/2016Motion to Stay Filed  Motion to Stay filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
09/02/2016Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Andrew Silver.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/13/2016Stay issued.Stay order issued 
11/09/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Intellectual Property Owners AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Richard F. Phillips
Ms. Sparkle T. Ellison
American Intellectual Property Law AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Peter E. Mims
Silver, AndrewRelatorMr. Edward B. Goolsby
Ms. Jane Langdell Robinson
Mr. Timothy C. Shelby
Mr. Iftikhar 'Ifti' Ahmed
Mr. Demetrios Anaipakos
National Association of Patent Practitioners, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Louis J. Hoffman
Mr. Shawn D. Blackburn
Mr. Ian B. Crosby
Austin Intellectual Property Law AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Stephen Dartt
Fox, Lawrence J.Amicus CuriaeMr. Robert Alan Blackwell
Mr. Lawrence J. Fox
Fédération Internationale Des Conseils En Propriété Intellectuelle Amicus CuriaeMr. Christopher T. Blackford
Tabletop Media, LLCReal Party in Interest Mr. Warren S. Huang  
Mr. Brett C. Govett
Mr. Jason K. Fagelman
Mr. Robert L. Greeson
Mr. Nathan B. Baum
Houston Intellectual Property Law AssociationAmicus CuriaeDaniel J. Krueger
Hricik, DavidAmicus CuriaeMr. David Hricik
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
500 SW3d 644, 08-17-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Craig Thomas Stoddart 
Trial Court Information
134th District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Dale B. Tillery 
DC-15-02268 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site