Supreme Court

Case: 16-0671    
16-0671
08/31/2016
Mandamus/Cause
IN RE XEROX CORPORATION AND XEROX STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC F/K/A ACS STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRelatorOral Argument Bench Book filed on behalf of Xerox Corp., et al.
12/05/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedReal Parties in Interest Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/29/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America submitted by William R. Peterson of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP of Houston, Texas.
07/05/2017Reply BriefRelatorReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Coporation, et al.
04/21/2017Brief on the MeritsReal Parties in Interest Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/16/2017Brief on the MeritsRelatorRelators' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Corp., et al.
12/07/2016Reply to ResponseRelatorReply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation, et al.
11/07/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus FiledReal Parties in Interest Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State of Texas.
08/31/2016Petition for Writ of MandamusRelatorPetition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation and Xerox State healthcare, LLC f/k/a ACS State Healthcare, LLC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of relators by David M. Gunn; Argued on behalf of real party in interest by J. Campbell Barker
12/05/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Bench Book filed on behalf of Xerox Corp., et al.
12/05/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
11/29/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America submitted by William R. Peterson of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP of Houston, Texas.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of relators, Xerox Corporation and Xerox State Healthcare, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by David M. Gunn of Beck Redden LLP of Houston, Texas.
11/06/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of real party in interest, the State of Texas. Oral Argument will be presented by J. Campbell Barker of the Texas Attorney General's Office of Austin, Texas.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 6, 2017. Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Mandamus Set to Argue  
09/01/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedCase set for oral argument 
07/05/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Coporation, et al.
06/06/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. Reply Brief is due July 5, 2017.
06/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation, et al.
05/19/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus reinstated   
05/19/2017Abatement Order Lifted Abatement order issued May 2, 2017 is lifted and the petition for writ of mandamus is reinstated.
05/10/2017Status report filed Status Report filed on behalf of State of Texas.
05/02/2017Order of the Court IssuedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedThe case is abated under Tex. R. App. P. 7.2(b) until further order of this Court.
05/02/2017Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedMatter in Supreme Court of Texas AbatedThe case is abated under Tex. R. App. P. 7.2(b) until further order of this Court.
05/02/2017Call received The Clerk spoke with Connie Pfeiffer, counsel for the relator, about whether the trial court judge may waive abatement of the case in order to allow successor judge to reconsider the original decision. The Clerk stated that he previously spoke with Jody Hughes, counsel for real party in interest, and informed Mr. Hughes that under Rule 7.2 the successor judge must reconsider the order and may not waive reconsideration. The Clerk stated that an abatement order would issue.
04/21/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
04/21/2017Notice received Pursuant TRAP 7.2(a), Notice regarding Automatic Substitution of the Respondent in this original proceeding filed on behalf of State of Texas. Judge Yelonosky has now retired. The judge handling the case in trial court is now the Honorable Sulak.
03/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedSecond Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. Real Party in Interest's brief is due April 21, 2017; Reply brief is due May 8, 2017.
03/28/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
02/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Real Party in Interest's brief is due April 7, 2017; and Reply brief is due April 24, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Real Party in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of The State of Texas.
02/16/2017Brief on the Merits Relators' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Corp., et al.
01/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Relator's brief is due February 16, 2017; Real party's brief is due March 8, 2017; Reply brief is due March 23, 2017.
01/17/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation, et al.
12/16/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Relator's brief due no later than January 17, 2017; Response brief due February 6, 2017; Reply brief due February 21, 2017.
12/07/2016Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation, et al.
11/07/2016Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of State of Texas.
10/07/2016Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than November 7, 2016.
09/06/2016Case forwarded to Court  
08/31/2016Case Record Filed  Mandamus Record Vol. I-III filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation, et al.
08/31/2016Petition for Writ of Mandamus Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Xerox Corporation and Xerox State healthcare, LLC f/k/a ACS State Healthcare, LLC.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/06/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Atlas Dental, LP, et alIntervenorMr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. E. Hart Green
Antoine Dental Center, et al.IntervenorMr. Jason D. Ray
Mr. E. Hart Green
Xerox State Healthcare, LLC f/k/a ACS State Healthcare, LLCRelatorMr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Eric J.R. Nichols
Mr. Christopher R. Cowan
Mr. Robert C. Walters
Ms. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. C. Andrew Weber
Xerox CorporationRelatorMr. C. Andrew Weber
Mr. Eric J.R. Nichols
Mr. Robert C. Walters
Ms. Constance H. Pfeiffer
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Christopher R. Cowan
State of TexasReal Party in Interest Mr. John Campbell Barker  
Mr. Jeffrey C. Mateer
Mr. Reynolds Brissenden IV
Mr. Scott A. Keller
Mr. Philip A. Lionberger
Mr. Raymond C. Winter
The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. William R. Peterson
Court of Appeals Information:
Denied 
___ SW3d ___, 02-26-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Honorable David E. Puryear 
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court 
Travis 
Honorable Timothy M. Sulak 
D-1-GV-14-000581-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site