Supreme Court

Case: 16-0662    
16-0662
08/29/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY AND BURLINGTON RESOURCES OIL & GAS CO., L.P. 
RALPH WADE KOOPMANN, KAREN MARIE KOENIG, LORENE H. KOOPMANN, AND LOIS STRIEBER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JERRY STRIEBER 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/11/2017Letter brief RespondentRespondents' Letter Brief filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company and Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co., L.P.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
04/26/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentRespondent's Joint Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
03/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Cory Pomeroy of Austin, Texas.
03/17/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co., et al.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lois Strieber.
02/21/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondents' Joint Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, Karen Marie Koenig, and Lorene H. Koopmann.
02/01/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co., et al.
10/28/2016Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, et al.
10/27/2016Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief submitted by George S. Christian filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League.
09/28/2016Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopman, et al.
08/29/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/11/2017Letter brief  Respondents' Letter Brief filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
12/05/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioners by Michael V. Powell; Argued on behalf of respondents by Mike Johanson
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibits filed on behalf of respondents, Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
12/04/2017Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company and Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co., L.P.
12/01/2017Call received Call received from attorney Carrie Schadle stating she will not be arguing before the Court.
12/01/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Call made to attorney Mike Johanson regarding who will be arguing on behalf of respondents.  Mr. Johanson will be arguing and Mr. Kevin Kyser will be sitting at the table.
11/28/2017Letter Filed Letter to the Clerk filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, et al.
11/09/2017Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel Kevin C. Kyser filed on behalf of respondents Ralph Wade Koopmann,  et al.
11/08/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted Mr. Johanson's office regarding the Notice of Appearance for Mr. Kevin Kyser.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, ConocoPhillips. Oral Argument will be presented by Michael V. Powell of Locke Lord, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondent, Lois Strieber. Oral Argument will be presented by Carrie Schadle of Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C., of Houston, Texas.
11/08/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of respondents, Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al. Oral Argument will be presented by Mike Johanson and Kevin Kyser of Johanson & Fairless, L.L.P. of Sugar Land, Texas.
06/30/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., December 5, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
06/16/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/16/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
04/26/2017Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Respondent's Joint Response to Amicus Brief filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
03/24/2017Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil and Gas Association. Submitted by Cory Pomeroy of Austin, Texas.
03/17/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co., et al.
03/02/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Contacted counsel for the petitioner and respondent to notify them that the Court has denied Respondents’ Motion to Reinstate the March 8, 2017 Reply Brief Deadline.
03/02/2017Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedRespondents’ Motion to Reinstate the March 8, 2017 Reply Brief Deadline denied
02/22/2017Miscellaneous Motion Respondents’ Motion to Reinstate the March 8, 2017 Reply Brief Deadline filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, et al.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lois Strieber.
02/21/2017Brief on the Merits Respondents' Joint Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopmann, Karen Marie Koenig, and Lorene H. Koopmann.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due March 3, 2017; and Reply brief is due March 20, 2017.
02/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Lois Strieber.
02/01/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioners' Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co., et al.
01/09/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
12/12/2016Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits is granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due February 1, 2017; Respondent's brief is due February 21, 2017; and Reply brief is due March 8, 2017.
12/12/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co.
12/05/2016Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 13th COA
12/02/2016Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than January 2, 2017; Response brief due January 23, 2017; Reply brief due February 7, 2017.
10/28/2016Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, et al.
10/27/2016Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief submitted by George S. Christian filed on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League.
10/04/2016MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time is granted. Reply is due October 28, 2016. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored.
10/04/2016Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co.
10/04/2016Case forwarded to Court  
09/29/2016Call received Call received from respondent regarding the resubmission of the response.
09/28/2016Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Ralph Wade Koopman, et al.
09/13/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Lois Strieber.
08/29/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, et al.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/05/2017Submitted (Awaiting Opinion)Submitted (Awaiting Opinion) 
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Koenig, Karen MarieRespondentMr. Chris M. Volf
Mr. G. Todd Taylor
Mr. Ronald B. Walker
Mr. J. Mike Johanson
Mr. Kevin Christopher Kyser
Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co., L.P.PetitionerMr. Andrew M. Buttaro
Ms. Elizabeth L. Tiblets
Mr. Kevin D. Cullen
Mr. Michael V. Powell
Mr. W. Scott Hastings
Strieber, LoisRespondentMr. Errol J. Dietze
Mr. D. Mitchell McFarland
Ms. Caroline C. Schadle
Koopmann, Lorene H.RespondentMr. Kevin Christopher Kyser
Koopmann, Ralph WadeRespondentMr. Kevin Christopher Kyser
Texas Oil and Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Cory Pomeroy  
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
ConocoPhillips CompanyPetitionerMr. Michael V. Powell
Ms. Elizabeth L. Tiblets
Mr. W. Scott Hastings
Mr. Andrew M. Buttaro
Mr. Kevin D. Cullen
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt 
___ SW3d ___, 05-19-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Rogelio Valdez 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
De Witt 
Honorable Jack W. Marr 
12-07-22,354 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site